Miller v. Haugrud
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2016-cv-00002 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
53
05/28/2018
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
54
05/28/2018
Order on Motion in Limine
55
05/28/2018
Order on Motion in Limine
56
05/28/2018
Order on Motion in Limine
05/29/2018
Docket Annotation - Public Officer-Agency (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
05/30/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
58
06/13/2018
Status Report
59
07/10/2018
Scheduling Order
60
09/10/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
61
09/12/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
62
10/10/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.