Miller v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00248 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/17/2018
Complaint
2
10/17/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
10/17/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
10/17/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
5
10/31/2018
Notice of Appearance
6
12/26/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
7
01/31/2019
Unissued Summons
01/31/2019
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
02/05/2019
Returned/Undeliverable Mail
9
02/27/2019
Summons Returned Executed
10
03/05/2019
Answer to Complaint
11
03/06/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
12
03/27/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
13
03/27/2019
Amended Answer to Complaint
14
04/01/2019
Order
04/12/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Scheduling Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
04/22/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
18
04/24/2019
Order
19
04/25/2019
Corporate Disclosure Statement
04/30/2019
Scheduling Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/30/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
04/30/2019
Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.