Mindy Mee Thao
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00182 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/11/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
06/11/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
06/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
06/11/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
06/11/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
06/12/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
06/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
06/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
06/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
07/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/13/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
07/19/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
13
08/07/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
08/08/2018
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
09/11/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
15
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
09/14/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.