Miriam Leah Braun
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2019-bk-00075 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/11/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
03/11/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
03/11/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
4
03/11/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
03/11/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
03/12/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
03/12/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
03/12/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
03/12/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
03/14/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
04/18/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
05/06/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.