Misty McKinney Chandler and James Donald Chandler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01720 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 171 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/20/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Misty McKinney Chandler, James Donald Chandler
2
04/20/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Joint Debtor James Donald Chandler, Debtor Misty McKinney Chandler.
4
04/20/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Joint Debtor James Donald Chandler, Debtor Misty McKinney Chandler.
5
04/20/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/30/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/29/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/17/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/30/2018.
6
04/20/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor James Donald Chandler, Debtor Misty McKinney Chandler.
7
04/20/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Joint Debtor James Donald Chandler, Debtor Misty McKinney Chandler.
04/20/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01720-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21984623. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
04/21/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
9
04/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/22/2018.
04/23/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Misty McKinney Chandler and James Donald Chandler Case Number 12-01328, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/16/2012, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 04/26/2016; Case Number 01-01140, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/20/2001, Standard Discharge on 06/08/2001.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
04/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/25/2018.
11
04/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Misty McKinney Chandler, Joint Debtor James Donald Chandler). Notice Date 04/25/2018.
12
05/29/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Atlas Acquisitions LLC.
13
05/30/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/30/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
14
06/04/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
15
06/04/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 14 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
16
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 15 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/06/2018.
17
06/29/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Joint Debtor James Donald Chandler, Debtor Misty McKinney Chandler (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Joint Debtor James Donald Chandler, Debtor Misty McKinney Chandler.). (Shinn, J.)
21
08/29/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.