Monica George
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00235 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/24/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
07/24/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
3
07/24/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
07/24/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
07/24/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
07/24/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
07/24/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
07/25/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
14
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/02/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
08/02/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
17
08/02/2018
Extend Automatic Stay
18
08/03/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
08/03/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
08/07/2018
Entry of Appearance
21
08/07/2018
Certificate of Service
22
08/07/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
23
08/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
24
08/13/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
08/13/2018
Add Party (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
08/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
26
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
27
08/20/2018
Proceeding Memo
08/20/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
08/21/2018
Entry of Appearance
29
08/21/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
08/23/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
08/24/2018
Extend Automatic Stay
31
08/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/30/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
09/12/2018
Proceeding Memo
33
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
34
09/26/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
35
10/01/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
36
10/02/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
37
10/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
38
10/12/2018
Withdrawal of Claim
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.