Monnin v. Olemaun et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

2:2018-cv-00003 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/07/2018
Notice of Removal
2
06/07/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
06/07/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
4
06/12/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
5
06/12/2018
Notice (Other)
6
06/12/2018
Notice of Service List
7
06/14/2018
Order
8
06/29/2018
Answer to Complaint
9
07/03/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
10
08/07/2018
Stipulation
08/08/2018
Order Dismissing Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.