Monster Concrete and Excavation, Inc
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80279 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/01/2018
Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Petition of Monster Concrete and Excavation, inc
165
12/10/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing
178
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
179
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
181
12/26/2018
Compensation
182
12/26/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
185
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
187
01/17/2019
Summary of Ballots
196
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
211
03/22/2019
Notice of Hearing - Van002

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.