Moondog v. Cordle et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00037 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
05/24/2018
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
10
06/04/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11
06/04/2018
Declaration
12
06/08/2018
Declaration
13
06/08/2018
Unissued Summons
14
06/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
15
06/15/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
16
06/21/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
17
06/22/2018
Declaration
18
06/27/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
06/27/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
06/27/2018
Unissued Summons
20
06/28/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
21
07/02/2018
Summons Returned Executed
22
07/03/2018
Summons Returned Executed
23
07/03/2018
Summons Returned Executed
24
07/18/2018
Declaration
25
07/19/2018
Notice (Other)
26
08/22/2018
Declaration
08/23/2018
Order of Recusal (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
08/28/2018
Notice of Appearance
29
08/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
30
09/11/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
31
09/18/2018
Answer to Complaint
32
09/21/2018
Scheduling Order
33
09/25/2018
Appoint Counsel
34
10/09/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
10/11/2018
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
10/23/2018
Summary Judgment
36
10/23/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
37
10/29/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
38
11/09/2018
Declaration
39
11/13/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
40
11/13/2018
Declaration
41
11/14/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
42
12/06/2018
Notice of Appearance
43
12/12/2018
Declaration
44
12/12/2018
Order
45
02/06/2019
Declaration
46
02/06/2019
Declaration
53
02/28/2019
Order
54
03/07/2019
Declaration
55
04/17/2019
Summary Judgment
56
04/18/2019
Order
57
04/25/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
58
05/06/2019
Reply to Response to Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.