Moore v. Colvin
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cv-00232 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 516 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/01/2014
COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin, filed by Keith A. Moore.
1
Notice of Appeals Council Action
1 Attachment
2
12/01/2014
Civil Cover Sheet
3
12/01/2014
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Keith A. Moore.
4
12/01/2014
Unissued summons re Defendant Colvin
1
Unissued Summons re Defendant Attorney General
2
Unissued Summons re Defendant US Attorney
2 Attachments
5
12/02/2014
ORDER: granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Service to be completed w/in 120 days from filing of complaint; clerk to issue summons and send to cnsl for service. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/02/2014.
12/02/2014
Summons Issued as to Carolyn W. Colvin, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/23/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle R. Mroczek on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin
7
12/29/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M. Guarino on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin
8
01/08/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith A. Moore. Carolyn W. Colvin served on 12/24/2014, answer due 2/23/2015.
9
02/23/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Unopposed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
10
02/23/2015
DECLARATION of Danielle R. Mroczek re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Unopposed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
11
02/26/2015
ORDER: granting Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response 9. Carolyn W. Colvin response due March 25, 2015. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 02/26/2015. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
12
03/25/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Carolyn W. Colvin.
13
03/25/2015
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record
1
Certification Page
2
Court Transcript Index
3
Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable
4
Payment Documents and Decisions
5
Jurisdictional Documents and Notices
6
Non Disability Related Development
7
Disability Related Development
8
Medical Records Part 1
9
Medical Records Part 2
10
Medical Records Part 3
11
Medical Records Part 4
11 Attachments
03/25/2015
Administrative Record consisting of 2 volumes received on 3/25/15 re dkt 13. Administrative Record are available conventionally at the clerk's office. (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
04/09/2015
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: admin rec due w/in 60 days of i/a by def; plf's opening brf due w/in 30 after filing of agency rec; def's answering brief due w/in 30 days of svc of plf's opening brf; reply may be fld w/in 14 days after svc of def's brf. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 04/09/2015. Modified on 5/14/2015 Create relationship to document #17
04/09/2015
Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket 14, when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
04/21/2015
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File merits Breif Soc Sec appeal by Keith A. Moore.
16
05/05/2015
ORDER: granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File 15. Plaintiff shall file her merits brief by May 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 05/05/2015. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
17
05/11/2015
MOTION to Remand by Keith A. Moore.
18
05/11/2015
Notice to Counsel re 17 MOTION to Remand filed by Keith A. Moore. A review of the document submitted at dkt 17 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 17. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page.
05/11/2015
Docket Annotation re 18 Notice Re: Chamber Copy. Parties are advised to disregard this notice as it was entered in error. (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
06/09/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION to Remand Unopposed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
20
06/09/2015
DECLARATION of Danielle R. Mroczek re 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION to Remand Unopposed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
21
06/11/2015
ORDER RE UNOPPOSED MOTION granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 17 MOTION to Remand is GRANTED. Responses due by 7/13/2015 Replies due by 7/27/2015. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 06/11/2015.
22
07/10/2015
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION to Remand Unopposed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
23
07/10/2015
DECLARATION of Danielle R. Mroczek re 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION to Remand Unopposed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
24
07/16/2015
ORDER: granting Defendant's Unoppposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to File 22 Response/Reply re 17 Motion to Remand. Responses due by 8/7/2015. Replies due by 8/21/2015. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 07/16/2015. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
25
08/06/2015
MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration Stipulated by Carolyn W. Colvin.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
26
08/10/2015
JUDGMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case is REVERSED and REMANDED for further administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). (See order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 08/10/2015. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2015: # (1) Judgment w/atty fees added) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2017: # (2) w/atty fees added. NEF regenerated)
27
09/16/2015
MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. Sect. 2412. (Unopposed) by Keith A. Moore.
1
Fee Agreement
2
Affirmation & Waiver of Direct Payment
2 Attachments
28
09/16/2015
RESPONSE in Support re 27 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. Sect. 2412. (Unopposed) Paul B. Eaglin filed by Keith A. Moore. Modified on 9/16/2015 See 09/16/2015 Docket Annotation and removed link to dkt 27
1
A All Professional Staff Time
2
B Attorney Time
3
C Paralegal Time
4
D Cost
5
Attorney's Affirmation In Support of Fees
6
Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order
7
EAJA Proposed Order
8
Certificate of Service
8 Attachments
09/16/2015
Docket Annotation IMMEDIATE ACTION NEEDED: Your recent electronic filing with the District of Alaska is in error: Wrong Event Selected re: 28 Response in Support of Motion, filed by Keith A. Moore. ACTION NEEDED: Attorney to refile the document using the event Memorandum and link it to the filing at docket 27. Modified on 9/16/2015 Create relationship to document #27 (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
09/17/2015
MEMORANDUM by Keith A. Moore 27 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. Sect. 2412. (Unopposed) filed by Keith A. Moore.
1
Exhibit A All Professional Staff Time
2
Exhibit B Attorney Time
3
Exhibit C Paralegal Time
4
Exhibit D Cost
5
Supplement Attorney's Affirmation In Support of Fees
6
Supplement Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order
7
Proposed Order EAJA Proposed Order
8
Supplement Certificate of Service
8 Attachments
30
09/28/2015
ORDER: granting Motion for Attorney's Fees 27. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 09/28/2015. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
31
11/05/2015
CLERK'S NOTICE returning Administrative Record to Counsel for Carolyn W. Colvin.
32
04/20/2017
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Howard D. Olinsky. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2318814.) by Keith A. Moore.
1
Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
33
04/21/2017
CLERK'S NOTICE re 32 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Howard D. Olinsky, at docket 32, is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d).
34
04/27/2017
MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. �406(b)(1) by Keith A. Moore.
1
Exhibit A - Notice of Decision
2
Exhibits B - Notice of Award
3
Exhibit C - Total Time
4
Proposed Order
4 Attachments
35
04/27/2017
DECLARATION of re [34] MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. �406(b)(1) by Keith A. Moore.
1
Certificate of Service
1 Attachment
36
05/03/2017
RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re [34] MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. �406(b)(1) filed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
37
05/04/2017
ORDER: granting Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for Attorney's Fees Pursuant to Social Security Act Section [34]. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 05/04/2017. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.