Morehouse v. Let's eat Out, Incorporated
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

5:2017-cv-02025 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 79 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1 Attachment
4
12/06/2017
Request for service by certified mail filed by Tiauna Morehouse.
12/12/2017
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2987416 (B4601085256). related document 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Let's Eat Out, Incorporated filed by Tiauna Morehouse.(AHI). Modified on 12/13/2017 (AHI). (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/12/2017
Summons Issued by the Clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Let's Eat Out, Incorporated. (AHI)
7
01/08/2018
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Let's Eat Out, Incorporated.
8
01/09/2018
TEXT ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on January 9, 2018.
1
Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
10
01/19/2018
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph M. McGreevy by Let's Eat Out, Incorporated.
1
Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
01/19/2018
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3009223 (B4601086150). Modified on 1/22/2018 (AHI). (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/19/2018
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3009230 (B4601086151). Modified on 1/22/2018. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
01/23/2018
ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Let's Eat Out, Incorporated.
13
03/26/2018
TEXT ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 3/26/2018.
14
04/27/2018
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Let's Eat Out, Incorporated.
15
04/30/2018
TEXT ORDER granting 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph M. McGreevy terminated. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 4/30/2018.
16
10/17/2018
NOTICE TO COUNSEL - This case is being reassigned from Judge Coogler to Judge Liles Burke. Please use case number 5:17-CV-2025-LCB on all subsequent pleadings
17
10/25/2018
TEXT ORDER: The parties are ordered to file a joint status report on or before November 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/25/2018.
19
10/31/2018
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Austin W. Anderson by Tiauna Morehouse.
1
Exhibit A - Cert. of Good Standing AWA
1 Attachment
20
10/31/2018
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William C. Alexander by Tiauna Morehouse.
1
Exhibit A - Cert. of Good Standing WCA
1 Attachment
21
10/31/2018
NOTICE by Tiauna Morehouse Notice of Filing Consent to Join
1
Exhibit A - E. Hernandez Consent to Join
1 Attachment
11/07/2018
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3213121. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3213129. (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
11/07/2018
TEXT ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/7/2018.
11/07/2018
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3213121 (B4601093340). (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3213129 (B4601093341). (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
11/07/2018
TEXT ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/7/2018.
24
11/08/2018
STATUS REPORT (Joint) and MOTION for Extension of Time by Let's Eat Out, Incorporated. filed by Let's Eat Out, Incorporated Modified on 11/8/2018
25
11/14/2018
ORDER that the parties have until 1/11/2019 to file a joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/14/2018. (AHI)
26
11/20/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by William Clifton Alexander on behalf of Tiauna Morehouse
27
11/20/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Winters Anderson on behalf of Tiauna Morehouse
28
01/14/2019
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
29
01/23/2019
SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS ACTION CERTIFICATION: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 10/22/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 11/21/2019; Witness and Exhibit Lists due 12/20/2019; Trial ready by 1/2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/23/2019.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.