Morris v. Trust Company of Virginia, et al. (lead)
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2012-cv-01020 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 631 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/20/2012
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trust Company of Virginia from Circuit Court of Montgomery, case number CV-12-901386. (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602024996)
1
State Complaint
2
Attachment 1
3
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
4
Receipt
4 Attachments
11/20/2012
(STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 28 ORDER DATED 05/17/2013) COMPLAINT against George Mason University Foundation, Inc., Karen Loulakis, Trust Company of Virginia, filed by Thomas Morris. See 1 complaint for this docket entry. (No pdf for this entry) Modified on 5/17/2013. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2012
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Thomas Morris. See 1 complaint for this docket entry. (No pdf for this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
11/20/2012
CONSENT to Removal re 1 Notice of Removal, by Karen Loulakis.
3
11/20/2012
CONSENT to re 1 Notice of Removal by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
4
11/20/2012
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Trust Company of Virginia.
5
11/21/2012
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Thomas Morris. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/3/2012.
1
Corporate Conflict Standing Order
1 Attachment
6
11/21/2012
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to George Mason University Foundation, Inc. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/3/2012.
1
Corporate Conflict Standing Order
1 Attachment
7
11/21/2012
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Karen Loulakis. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/3/2012.
1
Corporate Conflict Standing Order
1 Attachment
8
11/27/2012
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS AGAINST GEORGE MASON by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. Document has been edited to restrict access to personal information pursuant to the E-Government Act on 11/28/2012.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2012: #
6
REDACTED Exhibit A
7
Corrected Certificate of Service
7 Attachments
9
11/27/2012
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Trust Company of Virginia.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit Exhibit 14) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2012: #
15
Corrected certificate of service
15 Attachments
11/27/2012
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. (No PDF document attached to this entry; see 8 Motion.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2012
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by Trust Company of Virginia. (No PDF document attached to this entry; see 9 Motion.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
11/29/2012
BRIEFING ORDER directing that the 8 and 9 motions be submitted without oral argument on January 4, 2012; further ORDERED that the plaintiff file responses, which shall include a brief, on or before December 20, 2012; the defendants may file reply briefs on or before January 4, 2013; the motions shall be under submission on the due date of the reply brief, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/29/12.
11
11/29/2012
GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/29/12.
12
12/03/2012
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. re 6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to George Mason University Foundation, Inc. Modified on 12/4/2012 to create relationship to 6 Notice of Deficiency.
13
12/03/2012
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Karen Loulakis re 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
14
12/04/2012
SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Thomas Morris. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/14/2012.
1
Standing ORDER and sample format
1 Attachment
15
12/13/2012
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Thomas Morris re 14 SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Thomas Morris and 5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Thomas Morris. Modified on 12/14/2012 to create relationship to 14 and 5 Notices.
16
12/20/2012
RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS AGAINST GEORGE MASON filed by Thomas Morris.
17
12/20/2012
RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Thomas Morris.
18
01/04/2013
REPLY BRIEF The Trust Company of Virginia's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Trust Company of Virginia.
19
01/04/2013
REPLY BRIEF filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
20
04/15/2013
NOTICE by Trust Company of Virginia.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2013: #
2
Corrected certificate of service
2 Attachments
21
04/16/2013
ORDER directing that Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, on or before April 22, 2013, why the court should not dismiss his claims against Ms. Loulakis, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/16/13.
22
04/16/2013
NOTICE of PDF Correction re 20 Notice to reflect addition of corrected certificate of service.
1
Corrected certificate of service
1 Attachment
23
04/19/2013
Alias Summons issued as to Karen Loulakis; mailed CMRRR with copy of 1 Complaint.
24
04/19/2013
Response to 21 order to show cause filed by Thomas Morris. Modified on 4/19/2013 to correct docket text to reflect PDF document.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
04/19/2013
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 24 Reply to response to order to show cause to reflect changing text to "Response to 21 Order to Show Cause" pursuant to PDF document. (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
04/22/2013
Reply to 24 response to order to show cause re 24 Reply to response to order to show cause filed by Karen Loulakis.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
26
04/25/2013
Return Receipt Card showing service of 23 Alias Summons and 1 Complaint signed by (ILLEGIBLE) for Karen Loulakis served on 4/22/2013, answer due 5/13/2013.
27
05/13/2013
ANSWER to Complaint by Karen Loulakis.
28
05/17/2013
ORDER directing that the motions to dismiss (Docs. # 8, 9) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: (1) With regard to the claims Mr. Morris brings on his own behalf and on his mother's behalf, the motions are GRANTED, and those claims are DISMISSED with prejudice; (2) With regard to any claims Mr. Morris brings on behalf of his mother's estate that arose after she died, the motions are DENIED; further ORDERED that the complaint is STRICKEN with leave to replead on or before May 27, 2013, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/17/13.
29
05/27/2013
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Morris. (Main Document 29 replaced on 5/29/2013).
30
05/29/2013
NOTICE of PDF Correction re 29 First Amended Complaint to reflect addition of civil action number and jury demand on first page of pleading.
1
Corrected main document of docket entry
29
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01712083037" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01712083037','49539','105','','2','1','',''}};">29</a>)
2 Attachments
31
06/05/2013
Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadline re 29 Amended Complaint by George Mason University Foundation, Inc., Karen Loulakis, Trust Company of Virginia.
32
06/06/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadline re 29 Amended Complaint filed by Thomas Morris.
33
06/07/2013
ORDER directing that Defendants' 31 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is GRANTED to and including June 17, 2013. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/7/13.
34
06/17/2013
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Trust Company of Virginia.
35
06/17/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Trust Company of Virginia.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Trust Company of Virginia's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint
2
Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Trust Company of Virginia's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint
2 Attachments
36
06/17/2013
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Karen Loulakis.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
37
06/17/2013
MOTION to Dismiss by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
38
06/17/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
6 Attachments
06/17/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Karen Loulakis. (No PDF document attached to this entry; see 36 Motion.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
07/01/2013
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response, by Thomas Morris. Modified on 7/2/2013 to terminate second erroneous motion and to clean up docket text pursuant to PDF document.
07/01/2013
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to reflect termination of duplicate motion, and correction to docket text, pursuant to PDF document. (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
07/03/2013
ORDER granting 39 Motion for One Week Extension. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/3/13.
41
07/16/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 37 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, 34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint +Exhibits filed by Thomas Morris.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
42
07/16/2013
MOTION for Extension of Deadline July 15, 2013 re 41 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition, by Thomas Morris.
43
07/19/2013
ORDER granting 42 motion for an extension. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/19/13.
44
07/22/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Karen Loulakis.
45
07/22/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION to Dismiss REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
46
07/22/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Trust Company of Virginia.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
5 Attachments
47
08/23/2013
NOTICE of Change of Address by Alvin Latham (Peck) Fox, Jr
48
12/31/2013
MOTION Motion to Supplement Record re 44 Reply to Response to Motion, 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Karen Loulakis.
49
01/03/2014
ORDER: Defendant Karen Loulakis's Motion to Supplement the Record 48 is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/3/2014.
50
01/08/2014
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Trust Company of Virginia.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A to TCVA Motion to Consolidate
2
Exhibit Exhibit B to TCVA Motion to Consolidate
2 Attachments
51
01/13/2014
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why 50 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Trust Company of Virginia should not be granted as further set out. Show Cause Response due by 1/21/2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/13/2014.
52
01/21/2014
RESPONSE to Motion re 50 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Thomas Morris.
53
01/21/2014
MOTION for Hearing by Thomas Morris.
54
01/21/2014
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Karen Loulakis re 51 Order to Show Cause.
55
01/21/2014
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. re 51 Order to Show Cause. (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2014: # 1 Correct Certificate of Service).
56
01/23/2014
NOTICE by Trust Company of Virginia Notice of Clarification and Response to Plaintiff's Conditional Response
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
01/30/2014
***Attorneys Lowell Landis Sexton, Kenneth Abrams, Richard Joshua Cromwell, Alvin Latham (Peck) Fox Jr, Scott Samuel Brown, Michael Bruce Odom, and Rebecca A Beers added for their respective parties pursuant to 57 ORDER. (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
01/30/2014
ORDER directing that: (1) The Trust Company of Virginia's motion to consolidate (Docs. # 50 (original action), 105 (transfer action)) is GRANTED; (2) To facilitate the Clerk of the Court's maintenance of the docket, and to prevent the parties' duplicative filing of documents, Thomas Morris v. Trust Company of Virginia (Civil Action No. 2:12-cv-1020-WKW) is DESIGNATED as the lead case, and George Mason University Foundation, Inc. v. Thomas Morris, et al. (Civil Action No. 2:13-cv-930-WKW) is DESIGNATED as the member case; (3) All future motions, pleadings, notices, and other filings by the parties must be filed in the lead case; (4) The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to file this order in both the lead case and the member case. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/30/14.
58
02/04/2014
MOTION for Felicia A. Long to Withdraw as Attorney by Trust Company of Virginia. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2014: # 1 Corrected certificate of service).
59
02/06/2014
ORDER granting 58 Motion for Felicia A. Long to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/6/14.
02/06/2014
*** Attorney Felicia Abernathy Long terminated pursuant to 59 Order. (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
02/19/2014
MOTION for Hearing For Status Conference by Thomas Morris. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2014: # 1 Corrected certificate of service).
61
02/20/2014
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 60 MOTION for Hearing For Status Conference filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2014: # 1 Corrected certificate of service).
62
02/24/2014
MOTION to Dismiss by Trust Company of Virginia.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2014: #
5
Corrected certificate of service
5 Attachments
63
02/25/2014
RESPONSE to Motion re 60 MOTION for Hearing For Status Conference filed by Trust Company of Virginia.
64
02/26/2014
ORDER directing that the motion for hearing (Doc. # 53, lead case), the motion for oral argument (Doc. # 111, member case), and motion for status conference (Doc. # 60, lead case) are DENIED, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/26/14.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
65
03/17/2014
RESPONSE in Opposition re 62 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thomas Morris. (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2014: # 1 Corrected certificate of service).
66
03/24/2014
REPLY to Response to Motion re 62 MOTION to Dismiss - Reply in Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint filed by Trust Company of Virginia.
67
09/23/2014
ORDER directing that the parties' motions to dismiss and strike (Docs. # 73, 80, 95 in the member case) are DENIED, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/23/14.
68
09/23/2014
NOTICE of Non-Compliance regarding registration for electronic noticing.
69
09/23/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Clayton Bromberg, Jr on behalf of Karen G Loulakis, Karen Loulakis
70
09/23/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Preston MacKenzie, III on behalf of Karen G Loulakis, Karen Loulakis
71
09/26/2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that: (1) Ms. Loulakis's motion to dismiss (Lead Case Doc. # 36) is DENIED with respect to her 12(b)(5) defense, GRANTED with respect to her Rule 12(b)(2) defense, and DENIED AS MOOT with respect to all other 12(b) defenses; (2) Ms. Loulakis's motion for summary judgment (Member Case Doc. # 83) is DENIED AS MOOT; (3) Ms. Loulakis is DISMISSED as a party in both the lead and member cases. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/26/14.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
72
09/26/2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that (1) The Trust Company's motion to dismiss third-party claims for improper impleader (Member Case Doc. # 86 (as renewed in Lead Case Doc. # 62)) is GRANTED; (2) The Trust Company is DISMISSED as a third-party defendant in the member case. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/26/14.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
73
10/17/2014
ORDER directing that the pending motions to dismiss and for summary judgment (Lead Case Docs. # 34, 37 ; Member Case Docs. # 48, 51) are SET for oral argument on December 2, 2014, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 2-B, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. U.S. Courthouse, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama, 36104; Counsel for all parties are DIRECTED to attend; The parties' supplemental briefs must be filed on or before November 21, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/17/14. (Furnished to Calendar/AR)
74
10/28/2014
FIRST NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY REGARDING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION to Attorney Kenneth W. Abrams.
75
10/28/2014
FIRST NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY REGARDING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION to Attorney Richard J. Cromwell.
76
10/29/2014
Motion for Richard J. Cromwell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
77
10/29/2014
Motion for Kenneth W. Abrams to Appear Pro Hac Vice by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
78
11/04/2014
Filing fee re 76 Motion for Richard J. Cromwell to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 77 Motion for Kenneth W. Abrams to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 100.00, receipt number 4602034306
79
11/05/2014
TEXT ORDER granting 76 Motion for Leave for Richard J. Cromwell to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 77 Motion for Leave for Kenneth W. Abrams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/05/14. (No PDF document attached to this entry.)
80
11/14/2014
Motion for Matthew M. Farley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Trust Company of Virginia.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
11/14/2014
***Attorney Matthew M. Farley for Trust Company of Virginia added by Clerk's Office pursuant to 80 Motion. (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
11/17/2014
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 73 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, by Thomas Morris.
82
11/18/2014
ORDER directing that, upon consideration of Thomas Morris's motion for extension of time to respond to the court's order dated October 17, 2014, (Doc. # 81), and the extraordinary circumstances warranting an extension of time, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Mr. Morris's deadline for responding to the court's order is EXTENDED to November 25, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/18/14.
83
11/18/2014
Filing fee re 80 Motion for Matthew M. Farley to Appear Pro Hac Vice : $ 50.00, receipt number 4602034552
84
11/19/2014
TEXT ORDER granting 80 Motion for Leave for Matthew M. Farley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/19/14. (No PDF document attached to this entry.)
85
11/19/2014
MOTION for Extension of Deadline Briefing Deadline for All Parties by Trust Company of Virginia.
86
11/19/2014
ORDER directing that, upon consideration of the Trust Company of Virginia's motion to extend the briefing deadline for all parties, (Doc. # 85), it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; the parties' briefing in response to the court's October 17, 2014, order is due on or before November 25, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/19/14.
87
11/25/2014
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 73 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Trust Company of Virginia.
88
11/25/2014
MEMORANDUM AND MATTERS in Support Thereof Ordered for December 2, 2014 Hearing re 73 Order filed by Thomas Morris. Modified on 11/26/2014 to reflect actual title.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
5 Attachments
89
11/26/2014
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support (Member Case Doc. #51) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. Modified on 12/1/2014 to correct docket entry relationships.
90
12/02/2014
ORDER directing that: (1) On or before December 16, 2014, Mr. Morris shall submit proof of the filing of and disposition of his non-suit in the guardianship and conservatorship proceedings in Virginia; (2) On or before December 16, 2014, the Trust Company of Virginia shall identify in the existing record the order of the Montgomery County Circuit Court denying Mr. Morris's Rule 60(b) motion for relief from a judgment, and if the order is not in the record, the Trust Company shall supplement the record with the order and any other motions or pleadings giving context to that order; (3) On or before December 16, 2014, the parties may submit supplemental briefing that clarifies or responds to arguments raised during the December 2, 2014 hearing. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/02/14.
91
12/02/2014
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2014 re pending motions to dismiss and for summary judgment (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Risa Entrekin.) (Main Document 91 replaced on 12/3/2014).
92
12/05/2014
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of ORAL ARGUMENT Proceedings (PDF ACCESS RESTRICTED FOR 90 DAYS) held on December 2, 2014, before Honorable Judge W. Keith Watkins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Risa L. Entrekin, Telephone number 334-240-2405. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION DUE WITHIN 7 BUSINESS DAYS. Redaction Request due 12/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2015.
93
12/09/2014
Response to Order re 90 Order, by Trust Company of Virginia.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
4 Attachments
94
12/16/2014
Second Supplemental BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit Exhibit 8
9
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01712409137" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01712409137','49539','322','','2','1','',''}};">9</a> Exhibit Exhibit 9) Modified on 12/17/2014 to clarify text pursuant to PDF document. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2014: #
10
Corrected certificate of service
10 Attachments
95
12/16/2014
REPLY BRIEF re 90 Order, filed by Thomas Morris.
1
Exhibit F
2
Exhibit G
2 Attachments
96
02/27/2015
ORDER directing that, on before March 6, 2015, Plaintiff Thomas Morris shall supplement the record with a certified copy of the petition he filed, along with any other written submissions he made, to the Montgomery County Probate Court in support of the probate of Amy Falcon Morris's 2007 Will; further ORDERED that he shall submit to this court a certified copy of any transcript or order showing the Probate Court's finding(s) in support of venue in Montgomery County, Alabama, pursuant to Alabama Code ยง 43-8-162, if any such transcript or order exists; Mr. Morris is DIRECTED to serve copies of any submissions on all opposing parties. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on February 27, 2015.
97
03/05/2015
Supplemental Submission in Response to 96 Order, filed by Thomas Morris. Modified on 3/6/2015 to correct docket text pursuant to PDF document.
1
Part 1 of Record
2
Part 2 of Record
2 Attachments
98
03/31/2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that: (1) Full faith and credit is GRANTED to the order and decree of the Circuit Court of Virginia Beach, Virginia, adjudging the 1998 Will of Amy Falcon Morris to be her last will and testament and recognizing Karen Loulakis as executrix of Amy's Estate; (2) Full faith and credit is GRANTED to the monetary judgments of the Circuit Court of Virginia Beach, Virginia, entered against Thomas Morris and Sharon Duncan, jointly and severally, and in favor of Amy Falcon Morris ($1,125,222) and George Mason University Foundation, Inc. ($100,000); (3) Full faith and credit is DENIED to the order and decree of the Probate Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, adjudging the 2007 Will of Amy Falcon Morris to be her last will and testament and appointing Thomas W. Morris, as personal representative of Amy's Estate; (4) The Trust Company's and the Foundation's motions to dismiss Mr. Morris's amended complaint in the lead case (Lead Case Docs. # 34, 37) are GRANTED for all of the reasons set out in this opinion; (5) The Foundation's cross motion for summary judgment in the member case (Member Case Doc. # 51) is GRANTED; and (6) Mr. Morris and Ms. Duncan's cross motions for summary judgment in the member case (Member Case Docs. # 48, 60) are DENIED; further ORDERED that the Foundation is DIRECTED to file, on or before 4/7/2015, a current calculation of principal and interest owed by Mr. Morris and Ms. Duncan on the unpaid Virginia judgments; An appropriate final judgment will be entered separately. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/31/2015.
99
04/06/2015
RESPONSE to Court's 98 Memorandum Opinion and Order filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. Modified on 4/7/2015 to clarify text to reflect as a RESPONSE (not objection) as styled in main PDF document (qc/djy,).
04/07/2015
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 99 Objection to clarify text to reflect entry as a RESPONSE (not objection) as styled in main PDF document (NO PDF Document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
100
04/09/2015
MOTION to Alter Judgment 98 Memorandum Opinion and Order, Terminate Motions, or Amend Judgment by Thomas Morris. Modified on 4/22/2015 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of Sharon Duncan (qc/djy,).
101
04/15/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re 100 MOTION to Alter Judgment 98 Memorandum Opinion and Order, Terminate Motions, or Amend Judgment filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
102
04/21/2015
Amended MOTION to Alter Judgment 98 Memorandum Opinion and Order, Terminate Motions, or Amend Judgment by Thomas Morris. Modified on 4/22/2015 to clarify text as also filed on behalf of Sharon Duncan (qc/djy,).
103
04/21/2015
ORDER denying as premature 100 and 102 original and amended Motions to Alter or amend Judgment, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/21/15.
104
04/22/2015
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER directing that the Court's 98 Memorandum Opinion and Order is supplemented as provided herein, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/22/15.
105
04/22/2015
FINAL JUDGMENT, In accordance with the prior proceedings, opinions, and orders of the court, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Defs Trust Company of Virginia and George Mason University Foundation, Inc., and against Plf; further ORDERING that costs are TAXED against Plf, for which let execution issue; directing the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/22/15.
1
civil appeals checklist
1 Attachment
106
04/22/2015
FINAL JUDGMENT (applies to Member Case No 2:13cv930-WKW), in accordance with the prior proceedings, opinions, and orders of the court, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Plf George Mason University Foundation, Inc., and against Defs Thomas W. Morris and Sharon Duncan, in their individual capacities, jointly and severally, in the amount of $1,688,455.92, which sum accounts for $1,225,222.00 in principal and $463,233.92 in interest owed on the unpaid judgments imposed by the Circuit Court of Virginia Beach, Virginia; further ORDERING that costs are TAXED against defs Thomas W. Morris and Sharon Duncan, for which let execution issue; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/22/15.
1
civil appeals checklist
1 Attachment
107
05/06/2015
MOTION to Alter Judgment 106 Judgment, 98 Memorandum Opinion and Order, Terminate Motions, 105 Judgment, or Amend Judgment by Thomas Morris.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
108
05/07/2015
ORDER directing that the Trust Company of Virginia and George Mason University Foundation, Inc. may file a response to Thomas Morris and Sharon Duncan's 107 MOTION to Alter or amend 106 Judgment on or before 5/13/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/7/15.
109
05/13/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re 107 MOTION to Alter Judgment 106 Judgment, 98 Memorandum Opinion and Order, Terminate Motions, 105 Judgment, or Amend Judgment filed by Trust Company of Virginia.
110
05/13/2015
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 107 MOTION to Alter Judgment 106 Judgment, 98 Memorandum Opinion and Order, Terminate Motions, 105 Judgment, or Amend Judgment filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
111
05/13/2015
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 107 MOTION to Alter Judgment 106 Judgment, 98 Memorandum Opinion and Order, Terminate Motions, 105 Judgment, or Amend Judgment filed by Thomas Morris.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit N
8
Exhibit K
9
Exhibit L
10
Exhibit O
11
Exhibit P
12
Exhibit Q
13
Exhibit G
14
Exhibit I
15
Exhibit J
15 Attachments
112
05/28/2015
ORDERED that the 107 motion to alter or amend judgment is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/28/2015.
113
06/23/2015
NOTICE OF APPEAL Thomas by W. Morris and Sharon Duncan as to 105 Final Judgment and 106 Final Judgment entered on 04/22/2015, 98 Memorandum Opinion and Order entered on 03/31/2015, and 112 Order denying Motion to Alter Judgment entered on 05/28/2015.
114
06/23/2015
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 4602037261 re 113 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas W. Morris and Sharon Duncan.
115
06/23/2015
Appeal Instructions sent to Attorney L LANDIS SEXTON counsel for Thomas Morris and Sharon Duncan re 113 Notice of Appeal. A copy of the Transcript Information Form must be mailed to each court reporter from whom you are requesting a transcript.
116
06/23/2015
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, 105 FINAL JUDGMENT, 106 FINAL JUDGMENT, 98 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, 112 ORDERED DENYING 107 MOTION to Alter Judgment, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 113 Notice of Appeal.
1
APPEAL PACKAGE
1 Attachment
117
06/29/2015
USCA Case Number 15-12792-CC for 113 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris. (No hearings to be transcribed)
07/02/2015
Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: 113 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 15-12792-CC. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (Text entry; no document attached.)
118
08/18/2015
Entry of Dismissal issued as the MANDATE of USCA as to 113 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris, 11th Circuit Appeal No. 15-12792-CC;Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellants failed to file an appendix within the time fixed by the rules, effective August 18, 2015. FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION
119
09/29/2015
ORDER of USCA as to 113 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris, 11th Circuit Appeal No. 15-12792-CC; The Appellants' motion to reinstate the appeal is GRANTED. Before: WILLIAM PRYOR and JULIE CARNES, Circuit Judges.BY THE COURT:
120
12/28/2015
ORDER issued as the MANDATE 12/28/2015 of USCA as to 113 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris, 11th Circuit Appeal No. 15-12792-CC; Appellants' voluntary motion to dismiss the appeal with prejudice is GRANTED. BEFORE: WILLIAM PRYOR and JORDAN, Circuit Judges. BY THE COURT:
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.