Moses Evan Toyukak, Jr
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00290 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
15
09/11/2018
Show Cause (with hrg) (SA)
16
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
09/18/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
09/27/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
18
10/01/2018
Request for Special Notice
10/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
20
10/03/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
21
10/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
23
10/18/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
10/18/2018
Calendar Remark (Matter Continued / Rescheduled) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
10/18/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
25
10/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
10/24/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.