Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama

1:2007-cv-00508 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 635 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/17/2007
COMPLAINT against all plaintiffs (Filing fee $350 receipt number 496585, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1#
2
Exhibit Exhibit 2#
3
Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet
3 Attachments
2
08/08/2007
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians
1
Summons#
2
Summons#
3
Summons
3 Attachments
3
08/09/2007
Summons Issued as to United States of America & mailed to pltf's atty for service.
4
08/09/2007
Service Order entered 8/9/2007. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof.Service order deadline set to 9/24/2007. Signed by Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/9/07.
5
09/20/2007
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians. United States of America (Department of Justice, Washington, D.C.) served on 8/27/2007 by personal service, answer due 10/26/2007.
6
09/21/2007
NOTICE of Appearance by Lowell Landis Sexton on behalf of Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians
7
09/21/2007
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint served 09/14/07 as to Office of Federal Acknowledgment
8
10/02/2007
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians. United States of America served on 8/22/2007, answer due 10/26/2007.
9
10/03/2007
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara E. Culley on behalf of United States of America
10
10/03/2007
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by United States of America.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
11
10/09/2007
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due by 11/26/2007. Signed by Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/09/07.
12
11/26/2007
MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America.
1
Memorandum in Support of Motion#
2
Text of Proposed Order #
3
Exhibit 1#
4
Exhibit 2
4 Attachments
13
11/27/2007
Order entered on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 12 ; Plaintiff is to file a response on or before December 10, 2007; Any reply shall be filed no later than December 17, 2007; Responses due by 12/10/2007 for 12, Replies due by 12/17/2007 for 12 ; Signed by Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/27/07.
14
11/27/2007
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. Consent Form due by 12/17/2007.
1
notice of right to consent
1 Attachment
15
11/29/2007
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/14/2008. Signed by Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/29/07.
16
12/04/2007
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians.
17
12/17/2007
ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 12 MOTION to Dismiss; Responses due by 1/10/2008; Replies due by 1/24/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/17/07.
18
01/07/2008
This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of Chief United States District Judge Callie V. S. Granade; To ensure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-B after the case number on all future pleadings. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins.
19
01/10/2008
NOTICE by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians
20
01/10/2008
NOTICE by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians
21
01/10/2008
NOTICE by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians
22
01/10/2008
NOTICE by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians
23
01/10/2008
NOTICE by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians
24
01/10/2008
AFFIDAVIT of Cedric Sunray by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians.
25
01/10/2008
AFFIDAVIT of Wilford Taylor by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians.
26
01/10/2008
AFFIDAVIT Craig Taylor by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians.
27
01/10/2008
AFFIDAVIT of Verma Reed by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians.
28
01/10/2008
AFFIDAVIT L Landis Sexton by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians.
29
01/10/2008
MOTION to Continue by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians.
30
01/10/2008
MOTION to Amend Complaint by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians.
1
Amended Complaint
1 Attachment
31
01/10/2008
Evidentiary Material in Opposition of Summary Judgment filed by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians re: 12 MOTION to Dismiss.
1
Exhibit Exhibits 1-6
2
Exhibit Exhibit 7 Patr 1 of 2
3
Exhibit Exhibit 7 part 2 of 2
4
Exhibit Exhibits 8-9
5
Exhibit Exhibit 10
6
Exhibit Exhbits 11-18
7
Exhibit Exhibits 19-24
7 Attachments
32
01/10/2008
Brief re 12 MOTION to Dismiss in Opposition to Defendant Motion to Dismiss filed by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians.
33
01/11/2008
ORDER, Plf's 30 Motion to Amend is MOOT as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/11/08.
34
01/14/2008
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by United States of America.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
35
01/15/2008
ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant United States of America's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 34). The deadline for the parties' Rule 26(f) Report is extended to 2/7/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/15/2008.
36
01/17/2008
AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Mowa Band of Choctaw Indians.
37
01/24/2008
REPLY to Response to Motion 12 to Dismiss filed by United States of America.
1
Exhibit 3
1 Attachment
38
01/24/2008
RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Continue filed by United States of America.
39
02/07/2008
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
40
02/11/2008
Order re: parties' 39 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. A scheduling order will be entered, if necessary, after the Court has ruled on the pending Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/11/08.
41
07/02/2008
ORDER DENYING Plf's 29 Motion to Continue to Allow Discovery as set out, GRANTING Dft's 12 Motion to Dismiss as set out & DISMISSING this action. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/2/08.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.