Mullins, Jr. v. Bluegreen Corporation et al
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-ap-80030 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Objection
doc
05/24/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
105
12/13/2018
Notice of Hearing-Van200
108
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
113
12/21/2018
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
114
12/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
115
12/28/2018
Approving
116
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.