Muntaqim Saleem Thabit
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00015 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/18/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
01/18/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
01/18/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/18/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/18/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
4
01/18/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
01/18/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
6
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
7
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
01/21/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/22/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10
01/22/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
11
01/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
12
01/30/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
13
02/04/2019
Entry of Appearance
14
02/04/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
15
02/12/2019
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
16
02/19/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
17
02/19/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
02/19/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
02/19/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
19
02/19/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
20
02/19/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
21
02/19/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
22
02/19/2019
Certificate of Service
02/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
02/28/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
24
02/28/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
25
02/28/2019
Proceeding Memo
26
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
27
03/01/2019
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
03/12/2019
Calendar Remark (Objection Withdrawn) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
03/22/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
29
03/26/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
30
03/28/2019
Proceeding Memo
31
04/02/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
32
04/10/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
33
04/11/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
34
04/11/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
35
04/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
36
04/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.