Myers v. Aleutian Endeavors LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00033 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
02/02/2018
ORDER GRANTING CHANGE OF VENUE re: Defendants' 5 Motion to Dismiss or Change Venue and Plaintiff's 8 Motion to Transfer Venue. The court TRANSFERS this case to the United States District Court for the District of Alaska. No party is awarded its fees and costs related to the motions. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/5/2018.]
30
05/22/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
31
05/22/2018
Declaration
32
05/22/2018
Additional Related Document
33
05/22/2018
ORDER denying 25 Motion for Cure for Life. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/22/18.
34
05/29/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
35
06/04/2018
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/4/18.
36
06/18/2018
Sanctions
37
06/25/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
38
07/05/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
39
07/11/2018
ORDER re 36 Motion for Clarification and for Sanctions. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 7/11/18.
40
08/06/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
08/07/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
09/14/2018
Witness List
43
09/14/2018
Witness List
44
09/14/2018
Witness List
45
12/06/2018
Order
46
12/18/2018
Status Report
47
01/02/2019
Order
48
01/02/2019
In Limine
49
01/02/2019
Declaration
50
01/14/2019
Order
51
01/28/2019
Stipulation
52
01/29/2019
Order on Stipulation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.