Myers v. Maniilaq Association
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

2:2017-cv-00002 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
37
05/25/2018
Status Report
05/30/2018
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
06/08/2018
Status Report
40
06/26/2018
Summary Judgment
41
06/26/2018
Memorandum
42
06/26/2018
Affidavit
43
06/26/2018
Affidavit
44
06/26/2018
Summary Judgment
45
06/26/2018
Memorandum
46
06/26/2018
Affidavit
47
06/26/2018
Affidavit
48
07/13/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
07/16/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
07/20/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
07/23/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
07/30/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
53
08/01/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
08/01/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
08/15/2018
Notice of Settlement
08/20/2018
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
09/17/2018
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
58
09/17/2018
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.