Myrna Bernaldo Gonzales
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-00426 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/17/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
12/17/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
12/18/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
12/18/2018
Credit Counseling Waiver Requested (109(h)) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/20/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
6
12/20/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
7
12/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
12/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
12/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
12/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
12/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
12/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
12/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
01/03/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
15
01/10/2019
Proceeding Memo
16
01/10/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
17
01/14/2019
Extend Time (SA)
01/15/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
01/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/23/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
01/23/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
20
02/04/2019
Entry of Appearance
21
02/06/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
22
02/06/2019
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
23
02/06/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
24
02/06/2019
Notice Requiring Original Signature
25
02/06/2019
Clerks Notice of Fees Due (Not Deferred)
26
02/06/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
27
02/06/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
28
02/06/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
29
02/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
02/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
31
02/12/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
32
02/12/2019
Verification of Creditor Mailing Matrix
33
02/12/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
34
02/12/2019
Original Signature Submitted
35
02/12/2019
Schedules A-J
36
02/12/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
37
02/12/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
38
02/12/2019
Notice of Returned Check
02/12/2019
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
02/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
40
02/15/2019
Proceeding Memo
02/19/2019
Receipt (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
03/03/2019
Entry of Appearance
42
03/03/2019
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
43
03/03/2019
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
03/04/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
03/04/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
45
03/04/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
46
03/05/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
03/06/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
03/19/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
48
03/20/2019
Request for Special Notice
49
03/21/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
50
03/21/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
51
04/03/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
52
04/03/2019
Certificate of Service
53
04/04/2019
Proceeding Memo
54
04/04/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
55
04/07/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
04/09/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
05/07/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
57
05/07/2019
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
58
05/07/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
59
05/15/2019
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)
60
05/15/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
61
05/16/2019
Certificate of Service

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.