Myrvold v. Raibow Fiberglass & Boat Repair, LLC
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00245 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
18
04/11/2018
ORDER: re Motion to Dismiss 5. Within 14 days of the date of this order, Raibow shall file its answer to the Complaint. On or before May 4, 2018, the parties shall confer as to the scope of discovery. A status hearing to address the schedu ling of further proceedings shall be held on May 7, 2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Sharon Gleason in Anchorage Courtroom 3. Telephonic participation is anticipated via Meet-Me-Bridge-D (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 04/11/2018. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
23
06/21/2018
Status Report
24
07/31/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
09/12/2018
Order
28
09/20/2018
Status Report
29
09/21/2018
Order
30
10/17/2018
Order
31
10/17/2018
Order
10/17/2018
Settlement Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
Scheduling Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
11/09/2018
Strike
35
11/13/2018
Answer to Counterclaim
36
11/13/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
37
11/16/2018
Scheduling Order
38
11/21/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
39
11/21/2018
Pretrial Order
11/27/2018
Order on Motion to Strike (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
11/28/2018
Order
42
01/29/2019
Notice of Change of Address
43
04/19/2019
Notice of Appearance
04/19/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
04/19/2019
Withdraw as Attorney

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.