Myung Deok Ro and Ok Young Ro
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00333 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/02/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/02/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
10/02/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
10/02/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/05/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
8
10/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
10/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
10/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
10/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
10/11/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
13
10/11/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
14
10/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
15
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
16
10/19/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
17
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/22/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
10/22/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
10/23/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
11/28/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
20
11/28/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.