NaDia Damone Caruth
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04880 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 238 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/13/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by NaDia Damone Caruth
2
11/13/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth.
4
11/13/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth.
5
11/13/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth.
6
11/13/2017
Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth (Shinn, J.)
7
11/13/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth. (Shinn, J.)
11/13/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-04880-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21393656. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
11/13/2017
**INCORRECT NOTICE DUE TO JUDGE REASSIGNMENT** Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/20/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/23/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/20/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/14/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/20/2018. Modified on 11/14/2017
9
11/14/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11/14/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor NaDia Damone Caruth Case Number 02-00482, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/18/2002, Dismissed for Other Reason on 01/09/2004; Case Number 11-03113, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/17/2011, Standard Discharge on 02/06/2012; Case Number 15-02697, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/10/2015, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 08/28/2017; Case Number 10-01738, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/17/2010, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 05/18/2011.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
11/14/2017
Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 07-06, dated April 19, 2007, and Rule 9029 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, authorizing this Court to establish and promulgate local rules of practice and procedure not inconsistent with the Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, and subject to the requirements of Rule 83 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Any case filed by the same Debtor within 12 months of the date of entry of an Order of dismissal or of discharge of a prior case, shall be assigned to the same Judge from the prior case. 2. Any case filed by the same Debtor within 12 months of the date of closing a prior case, shall be assigned to the same Judge from the prior case. 3. Any case filed by a debtor that already has a case pending, shall be assigned to the same judge as the pending case. 4. If any such case has been assigned either by the random or by the automatic Judge assignment and is inconsistent with Administrative Order No. 07-06, the Clerk's office shall reassign the case consistent with said Administrative Order.Judge Tamara O Mitchell added to case. Involvement of Judge D. Sims Crawford Terminated
11
11/14/2017
Amended (Due to Judge Reassignment) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/20/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 2/20/2018.Proofs of Claims due by 3/20/2018.Government Proof of Claim due by 5/14/2018.Confirmation hearing to be held on 1/18/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
12
11/14/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 6 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth). Hearing scheduled 11/30/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
13
11/14/2017
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Certificate of Service was not dated Filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth (RE: related document(s) 6 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay). (Shinn, J.)
14
11/14/2017
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth (RE: related document(s) 6 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay). (Shinn, J.)
15
11/14/2017
Notice of Change of Address (matrix has already been updated) Filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth. (Shinn, J.)
16
11/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/15/2017.
17
11/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 11/16/2017.
18
11/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth). Notice Date 11/16/2017.
19
11/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/16/2017.
20
11/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 12 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/16/2017.
21
11/17/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
22
11/30/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/30/2017 10:47:26 AM ]. File Size [ 472 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:19 ]. (RE: Doc #6; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay). (adiuser).
23
11/30/2017
Motion to Determine Value of 2010 Mercury Mariner financed by Santander Consumer USA Filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth (Shinn, J.)
24
11/30/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 11/30/2017 (RE: related document(s) 6 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
25
12/01/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 23 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
26
12/02/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/02/2017.
27
12/03/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/03/2017.
28
12/19/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Atlas Acquisitions LLC.
29
12/21/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/20/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
30
12/26/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
31
12/27/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 30 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
32
12/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/29/2017.
33
01/18/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
34
01/19/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/18/2018 11:43:42 AM ]. File Size [ 1035 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:52 ]. (RE: Doc #6; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay). (adiuser).
35
01/19/2018
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 1/19/2018 (RE: related document(s) 6 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth, 11 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13, 23 Granted - Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor NaDia Damone Caruth, 30 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 2/8/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
36
01/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/21/2018.
37
01/23/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.