Nadine M. Taniguchi
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00015 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
61
06/05/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
62
07/23/2018
Modified Plan (After Confirmation) (BKPLAN03)
63
07/23/2018
Notice of Modified Ch 13 Plan With Objection Deadline
64
07/24/2018
Modify Plan (After Confirmation)
65
08/16/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
66
08/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
67
09/18/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
68
09/18/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
69
09/18/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
70
09/18/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
71
09/19/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
09/19/2018
QC Remark Re: Summary, Stat & Declaration (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
10/18/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
73
11/13/2018
Non-Opposition
74
11/13/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
75
11/14/2018
Approving Modification of Plan (BKPLAN05) (SA)
11/14/2018
Terminate Document / Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
11/26/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
77
01/25/2019
Declaration
78
01/25/2019
Certificate of Service
79
02/01/2019
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
80
02/01/2019
Order (Generic) (SA)
81
02/11/2019
Generic Motion / Application
02/22/2019
Update Hearing for JRP / Calendar (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
02/22/2019
Hearing
83
02/26/2019
Modified Plan (After Confirmation) (BKPLAN03)
84
02/26/2019
Modify Plan (After Confirmation)
85
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
86
03/01/2019
Proceeding Memo
87
03/05/2019
Relief from Stay
88
03/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
03/14/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.