Nancy May Anderson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00296 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
09/14/2018
Request for Special Notice
11
09/17/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
12
09/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
09/24/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
14
09/24/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
15
09/24/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
16
09/24/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
17
09/24/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
09/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
10/03/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
19
10/03/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
20
10/03/2018
Certificate of Service
10/03/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
10/04/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
10/04/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/05/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
10/07/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/07/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
10/13/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
10/29/2018
Certificate of No Objection
25
10/29/2018
Certificate of Service
26
11/09/2018
Relief from Stay
27
11/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
11/19/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
29
11/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
11/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
31
12/04/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
32
12/07/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
33
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
12/17/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.