Nanouk v. The United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00221 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
149
05/22/2018
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
150
05/22/2018
Memorandum
151
05/22/2018
Declaration
152
05/22/2018
Declaration
153
05/22/2018
Leave to File Document
154
05/23/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
155
06/01/2018
Summary Judgment
156
06/01/2018
Memorandum
157
06/01/2018
In Limine
158
06/01/2018
Memorandum
159
06/01/2018
Declaration
160
06/15/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
161
06/15/2018
Declaration
162
06/19/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
163
06/19/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
164
06/20/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
165
06/21/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
166
06/21/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
167
07/11/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
168
07/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
169
07/18/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
170
07/18/2018
Declaration
171
07/18/2018
File Excess Pages
172
07/18/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
173
07/18/2018
Statement
07/19/2018
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
174
07/18/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
175
07/18/2018
Declaration
176
07/18/2018
Declaration
177
07/18/2018
Declaration
179
07/19/2018
Leave to File Document
180
07/19/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
181
07/19/2018
Errata
182
07/20/2018
Notice (Other)
183
07/31/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
184
08/02/2018
Notice (Other)
08/02/2018
Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected (Text entry; no document attached.)
185
08/02/2018
Hearing
186
08/08/2018
Response in Support of Motion
187
08/08/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
188
08/13/2018
Hearing
189
08/14/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
190
08/22/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
191
08/27/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
192
09/12/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing
09/27/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.