Napayonak v. Guzman
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00186 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
76
05/18/2018
Amend/Correct
77
05/18/2018
Additional Related Document
78
05/18/2018
Additional Related Document
79
05/18/2018
Additional Related Document
80
05/18/2018
Additional Related Document
81
05/31/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
82
06/01/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
83
06/05/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
84
06/07/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
85
07/03/2018
~Util - Set Hearings
86
07/03/2018
Amended Complaint
87
07/03/2018
Additional Related Document
88
07/03/2018
Additional Related Document
89
07/03/2018
Additional Related Document
90
07/03/2018
Additional Related Document
91
07/17/2018
Answer to Amended Complaint
92
08/02/2018
Notice of Change of Address
93
08/06/2018
Notice of Change of Address
94
08/06/2018
Status Report
08/09/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Order Reassigning Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
97
08/15/2018
Notice (Other)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.