Natasha Williams
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02102 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
05/21/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Corrective Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/23/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
32
01/11/2019
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
33
01/15/2019
Transfer of Claim
34
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.