Nathan Mattie
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00195 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/22/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
06/22/2018
Initial Statement About an Eviction Judgment (Form 101A)
3
06/22/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
06/22/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
06/22/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
06/22/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/25/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
07/11/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
13
07/11/2018
Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay (11 USC 362(k)) (CM32)
07/12/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
07/12/2018
Entry of Appearance
15
07/12/2018
Excepted from Electronic Filing
16
07/12/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
17
07/12/2018
Certificate of Service
19
07/13/2018
Certificate of Service
20
07/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
07/16/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
22
07/16/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
07/16/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
07/19/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
25
07/20/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
07/20/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
07/23/2018
Generic Motion / Application
28
07/24/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
29
07/24/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
30
07/24/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
31
07/24/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
07/24/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
07/24/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
07/24/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
07/30/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
07/30/2018
Calendar Remark (Objection Withdrawn) (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
08/01/2018
Generic Motion
08/01/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
08/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
08/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
38
08/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
39
08/10/2018
Reconsider
40
08/15/2018
Reconsider
08/15/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
08/17/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
08/17/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
08/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
43
08/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/20/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
09/04/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.