National Credit Union v. Credit Suisse Group AG
Court Docket Sheet

2nd Circuit Court of Appeals

2017-02383 (ca2)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/31/2017
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant National Credit Union Administration Board, FILED. [2094150] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/04/2017 03:49 PM]
2
07/31/2017
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant National Credit Union Administration Board, district court receipt # 0208-13960626, FILED.[2094160] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/04/2017 03:53 PM]
3
07/31/2017
DISTRICT COURT ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/05/2017, RECEIVED.[2094164] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/04/2017 03:54 PM]
4
07/31/2017
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2094169] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/04/2017 03:55 PM]
9
08/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation, FILED. Service date 08/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2098080] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/10/2017 04:16 PM]
10
08/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 08/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2098083] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/10/2017 04:19 PM]
11
08/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Arthur J. Burke, [9], in place of attorney Paul S. Mishkin, SUBSTITUTED.[2098319] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/11/2017 09:32 AM]
12
08/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Arthur J. Burke, [10], in place of attorney Peter John Davis, SUBSTITUTED.[2098321] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/11/2017 09:34 AM]
14
08/14/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant National Credit Union Administration Board, FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2100120] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/14/2017 03:11 PM]
15
08/14/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant National Credit Union Administration Board, FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2100132] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/14/2017 03:15 PM]
16
08/14/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant National Credit Union Administration Board, FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2100147] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/14/2017 03:19 PM]
17
08/14/2017
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant National Credit Union Administration Board, FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2100150] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/14/2017 03:22 PM]
19
08/14/2017
ATTORNEY, David Charles Frederick for Appellant National Credit Union Administration Board, in case 17-2383, [15], ADDED.[2100244] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/14/2017 03:50 PM]
21
08/15/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101212] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:39 PM]
22
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101238] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:51 PM]
23
08/15/2017
ATTORNEY, Daryl Libow for Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., in case 17-2383, [22], ADDED.[2101354] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/15/2017 03:42 PM]
24
08/15/2017
MOTION, to consolidate appeals, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant National Credit Union Administration Board, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101385] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/15/2017 03:56 PM]
26
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101593] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/15/2017 07:11 PM]
27
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group International, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101594] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/15/2017 07:13 PM]
29
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101950] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:05 AM]
30
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102009] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:30 AM]
31
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Henninger S. Bullock for Societe Generale S.A., TERMINATED.[2102174] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 12:48 PM]
32
08/16/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitue Counsel, [26], on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED.[2102240] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 01:53 PM]
33
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group International, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102440] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 03:55 PM]
34
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102441] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 03:56 PM]
35
08/16/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [27], on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group International, FILED.[2102550] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:19 PM]
36
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [33], in place of attorney Elai Katz, SUBSTITUTED.[2102555] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:26 PM]
37
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [34], in place of attorney Adam Mintz, SUBSTITUTED.[2102557] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:28 PM]
38
08/16/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [34], on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED.[2102559] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:29 PM]
39
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102562] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:34 PM]
40
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102564] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:36 PM]
41
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102565] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:38 PM]
42
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Rabobank Group, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102593] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:32 PM]
43
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rabobank Group, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102595] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:35 PM]
44
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102597] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:37 PM]
45
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rabobank Group, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102598] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:39 PM]
46
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102600] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:40 PM]
47
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102603] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:44 PM]
48
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse Group International, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102614] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 07:01 PM]
49
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102650] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:28 PM]
50
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Paul S. Mishkin for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., in case 17-2383, [40], ADDED.[2102829] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 10:00 AM]
51
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Gabor Mehes for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., in case 17-2383, [41], ADDED.[2102845] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 10:05 AM]
52
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102920] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 10:38 AM]
53
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102960] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 10:58 AM]
54
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103009] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:15 AM]
55
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Appellee Rabobank Group, in case 17-2383, [43], ADDED.[2103081] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:47 AM]
56
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, David R. Gelfand, [44], in place of attorney Mark D. Villaverde, SUBSTITUTED.[2103092] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:49 AM]
57
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Appellee Rabobank Group, in case 17-2383, [45], ADDED.[2103101] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:52 AM]
58
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2383, [46], ADDED.[2103106] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:54 AM]
59
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2383, [47], ADDED.[2103140] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 12:14 PM]
60
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103370] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:39 PM]
61
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103373] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:43 PM]
62
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG and WestLB AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103414] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 03:01 PM]
63
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Thomas Smith, [49], in place of attorney Brian J. Poronsky, SUBSTITUTED.[2103684] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 04:35 PM]
64
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Capital Inc., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103780] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 05:17 PM]
65
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103801] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/17/2017 05:40 PM]
66
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Henninger S. Bullock for Appellee Societe Generale S.A., in case 17-2383, [53], ADDED.[2104089] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:47 AM]
67
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew Calica for Appellee Societe Generale S.A., in case 17-2383, [54], ADDED.[2104109] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:57 AM]
68
08/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104142] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:11 AM]
69
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104151] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:14 AM]
70
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104160] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:17 AM]
71
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Aidan Synnott for Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, in case 17-2383, [61], ADDED.[2104179] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:27 AM]
72
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan D. Schiller for Appellee Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-2383, [64], ADDED.[2104438] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 01:11 PM]
73
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Benjamin Fleming for Appellees HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2383, [70], ADDED.[2104473] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 01:38 PM]
74
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Marc J. Gottridge, [69], in place of attorney Lisa J. Fried, SUBSTITUTED.[2104497] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 01:51 PM]
75
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse Group International, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104576] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:32 PM]
76
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse Group International, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104584] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:36 PM]
77
08/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays Capital Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104589] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:38 PM]
78
08/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citi Swapco Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc. and Citigroup, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104620] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:50 PM]
79
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse Group International, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104634] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:57 PM]
80
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse Group International, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104692] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 03:21 PM]
81
08/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104995] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 08:31 PM]
82
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105002] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:39 PM]
83
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105003] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:43 PM]
84
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105006] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:51 PM]
85
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105007] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:54 PM]
86
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105011] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:59 PM]
87
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Herbert Scott Washer for Appellees Credit Suisse Group International and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2383, [75], ADDED.[2105056] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/20/2017 11:58 AM]
88
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Appellees Credit Suisse Group International and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2383, [76], ADDED.[2105060] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/20/2017 02:40 PM]
89
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander Nuo Li for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2383, [86], ADDED.[2105458] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:41 AM]
90
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Abram Ellis for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2383, [85], ADDED.[2105466] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:43 AM]
91
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan C. Turner for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2383, [84], ADDED.[2105495] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:50 AM]
92
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Mary Beth Forshaw for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2383, [83], ADDED.[2105500] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:51 AM]
93
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Paul C. Gluckow for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2383, [82], ADDED.[2105504] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:53 AM]
94
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Appellees Credit Suisse Group International and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2383, [80], ADDED.[2105918] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/21/2017 01:16 PM]
95
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Jason M. Hall for Appellees Credit Suisse Group International and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2383, [79], ADDED.[2105927] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/21/2017 01:24 PM]
96
08/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 08/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2106217] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/21/2017 03:52 PM]
97
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, David Sapir Lesser [96], in place of attorney Frank L. Hunter, Jr., SUBSTITUTED.[2106230] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/21/2017 04:00 PM]
98
08/22/2017
NOTICE, to Appellees UBS AG,HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Bank USA for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2106773] [17-2383]--[Edited 08/22/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/22/2017 10:04 AM]
99
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107252] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/22/2017 12:16 PM]
100
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107532] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/22/2017 03:08 PM]
101
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107889] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/22/2017 11:48 PM]
102
08/23/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF. [2108942] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/23/2017 09:41 PM]
104
08/24/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [102], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2109268] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/24/2017 10:55 AM]
105
08/24/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF. [2109289] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/24/2017 11:05 AM]
111
08/24/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [104], [105], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2109684] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/24/2017 04:08 PM]
112
08/24/2017
ATTORNEY, Christian T. Kemnitz for Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-2383, [105], ADDED.[2109746] [17-2383] [Entered: 08/24/2017 04:38 PM]
114
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113038] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:35 PM]
115
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2351, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113039] [17-2351, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:46 PM]
116
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2351 Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2381 Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2383 Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2360, [115], ADDED.[2113695] [17-2351, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 08/30/2017 01:28 PM]
117
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2347 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2413 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2352 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2351 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2376 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2343 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2381 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2383, [114], ADDED.[2114140] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/30/2017 04:34 PM]
118
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116900] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:29 PM]
119
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, 17-1569, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116903] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:32 PM]
120
09/06/2017
NOTE: See lead case, 17-1569, containing complete set of docket entries.[2117623] [17-2383] [Entered: 09/06/2017 10:33 AM]
123
09/07/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2118621] [17-2383, 17-1569] [Entered: 09/07/2017 09:23 AM]
124
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, in case 17-1989, [2121285-2], ADDED.[2121303] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:07 PM]
126
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2383, [125], ADDED.[2121449] [17-2383] [Entered: 09/11/2017 03:11 PM]
148
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays PLC in 17-1569, -- Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1915, 17-2056, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC in 17-2343, 17-2352, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and -- Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2351, 17-2381, Appellee Barclays PLC in 17-2360, 17-2383, 17-2413, 17-2347, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2169995] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2352, 17-2351, 17-2381, 17-2360, 17-2383, 17-2413, 17-2347] [Entered: 11/13/2017 09:09 AM]
149
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1569, -- Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1915, Barclays Bank PLC in 17-1989, 17-2056, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC in 17-2343, 17-2347, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and -- Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2351, 17-2352, Appellee Barclays Banks PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2360, 17-2381, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays Capital Inc. in 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2170005] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 09:16 AM]
150
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1569, -- Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1915, Barclays Bank PLC in 17-1989, 17-2056, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC in 17-2343, 17-2347, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and -- Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2351, 17-2352, Appellee Barclays Banks PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2360, 17-2381, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays Capital Inc. in 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2170021] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 09:21 AM]
151
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1569, -- Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1915, Barclays Bank PLC in 17-1989, 17-2056, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC in 17-2343, 17-2347, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and -- Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2351, 17-2352, Appellee Barclays Banks PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2360, 17-2381, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays Capital Inc. in 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2170027] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 09:25 AM]
152
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- City of Richmond, County of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, Riverside Public Financing Authority, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority and Appellant David E. Sundstrom in 17-2413, -- City of Richmond, County of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, San Diego Association of Governments, The County of Mendocino and Appellant City of Houston and David E. Sundstrom in 17-1569, -- City of Richmond, County of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, Riverside Public Financing Authority, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority in 17-1915, 17-2056, Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2170226] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 11/13/2017 10:58 AM]
153
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, -- City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, San Diego Association of Governments and Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Houston and Riverside Public Financing Authority in 17-1569, -- City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority and Regents of the University of California in 17-1915, 17-2056, -- City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority, Regents of the University of California and Appellant California Public Plaintiffs and The County of Mendocino in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2170286] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 11:26 AM]
154
11/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert S. Kitchenoff for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1569 Robert S. Kitchenoff for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-2413 Robert S. Kitchenoff for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-2056 Robert S. Kitchenoff for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1989 Robert S. Kitchenoff for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1915, [146], ADDED.[2170761] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 03:41 PM]
155
11/13/2017
ATTORNEY, David H. Weinstein for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1569 David H. Weinstein for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-2413 David H. Weinstein for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-2056 David H. Weinstein for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1989 David H. Weinstein for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1915, [147], ADDED.[2170824] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 04:03 PM]
156
11/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Mary Beth Forshaw for J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1989 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1915 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1569 Mary Beth Forshaw for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. JP Morgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2347 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2413 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2352 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2351 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2376 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2343 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2056 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2381 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2383 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2360, [2169838-2], [2169837-2], [2169836-2], [2169835-2], ADDED.[2170873] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 04:13 PM]
157
11/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Jeremy Andersen for Prudential Investment Portfolios 2 Capital Ventures International Salix Capital US Inc. Darby Financial Products, in case 17-1569, [2169881-2], ADDED.[2170942] [17-1569, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 04:34 PM]
158
11/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Daniel Paul Cunningham for City of Philadelphia Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority Prudential Investment Portfolios 2 Salix Capital US Inc. Darby Financial Products, in case 17-1569, [2169877-2], [2169876-2], ADDED.[2170963] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 04:44 PM]
159
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 32, (pp. 1-300), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171008] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:13 PM]
160
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 32, (pp. 301-600), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171010] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:17 PM]
161
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant 303030 Trading LLC, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Nathaniel Haynes, Gary Francis and Metzler Investment GmbH in 17-2056, 17-1569, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2171019] [17-2056, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2343, 17-1989, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:24 PM]
162
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 32, (pp. 601-900), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171021] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:27 PM]
163
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 32, (pp. 901-1200), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171025] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:30 PM]
164
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 32, (pp. 1201-1500), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171029] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:34 PM]
165
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 32, (pp. 1501-1800), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171036] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:40 PM]
166
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 7 of 32, (pp. 1801-2100), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171044] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:54 PM]
167
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 8 of 32, (pp. 2101-2400), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171047] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:00 PM]
168
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 9 of 32, (pp. 2401-2700), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171049] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:04 PM]
169
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 10 of 32, (pp. 2701-3000), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171057] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:08 PM]
170
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 11 of 32, (pp. 3001-3300), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171058] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:11 PM]
171
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 12 of 32, (pp. 3301-3600), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171061] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:13 PM]
172
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 13 of 32, (pp. 3601-3900), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171063] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:16 PM]
173
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 14 of 32, (pp. 3901-4200), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171064] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:19 PM]
174
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 15 of 32, (pp. 4201-4500), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171067] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:22 PM]
175
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 16 of 32, (pp. 4501-4800), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171071] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:25 PM]
176
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 17 of 32, (pp. 4801-5100), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171072] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:31 PM]
177
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 18 of 32, (pp. 5101-5400), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171077] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:35 PM]
178
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 19 of 32, (pp. 5401-5700), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171079] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:53 PM]
179
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 20 of 32, (pp. 5701-6000), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171081] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:59 PM]
180
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 20 of 32, (pp. 5701-6000), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171082] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 07:11 PM]
181
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 21 of 32, (pp. 6001-6300), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171084] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 07:19 PM]
182
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 22 of 32, (pp. 6301-6600), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171087] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 07:33 PM]
183
11/13/2017
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Confidential Joint Appendix (Filed Under Seal), on behalf of Appellant 303030 Trading LLC, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, Gary Francis, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Nathaniel Haynes and Metzler Investment GmbH in 17-1569, 17-2056, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by US mail.[2171093] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 07:48 PM]
184
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 23 of 32, (pp. 6601-6900), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171095] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:16 PM]
185
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 24 of 32, (pp. 6901-7200), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171096] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:18 PM]
186
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 25 of 32, (pp. 7201-7500), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171097] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:25 PM]
187
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 26 of 32, (pp. 7501-7800), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171099] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:26 PM]
188
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 27 of 32, (pp. 7801-8100), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171103] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:35 PM]
189
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 28 of 32, (pp. 8101-8400), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171104] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:36 PM]
190
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 29 of 32, (pp. 8401-8700), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171106] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:43 PM]
191
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 30 of 32, (pp. 8701-9000), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171109] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:53 PM]
192
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 31 of 32, (pp. 9001-9300), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171110] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:54 PM]
193
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 32 of 32, (pp. 9301-9423), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171113] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:59 PM]
194
11/13/2017
SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171114] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 09:00 PM]
195
11/13/2017
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for CONFIDENTIAL JOINT BRIEF FOR PLAINTIFFS-APPELLANTS REGARDING PERSONAL JURISDICTION (FILED UNDER SEAL), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171123] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 09:47 PM]

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.