National Electrical Benefit Fund v. Powersource Telecom, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-mc-00021 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/15/2018
Registration of Foreign Judgment
2
06/15/2018
Certificate of Service
06/15/2018
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
08/08/2018
Application for Writ
08/14/2018
Writ of Garnishment (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
09/11/2018
Affidavit of Service
5
12/19/2018
Release of Funds
6
02/28/2019
Order on Motion for Release of Funds

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.