National Union Fire v. Foster, et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:1996-cv-00756 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 663 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/07/1996
COMPLAINT (Exhibits I - IV attached) Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 59900 (dkt clerk)
2
05/07/1996
MOTION by National Union Fire for Frank G. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 59901 referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dkt clerk)
3
05/08/1996
SUMMONS issued for Edna Foster, Alice King, Sandra Baker, Terica Baker, Linda Woods, Jimmy Peters; summons and complaint mailed cmrrr to named defendants. (dkt clerk)
05/08/1996
File referred to Judge Albritton. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
05/09/1996
ORDER granting [2-1] motion for Frank G. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 59901 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel. (dkt clerk)
5
05/10/1996
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on Kenley Finlay on 5/9/96 for Terica Baker, Alice King, Sandra Baker, Edna Foster, Linda Woods. Answer due on 5/29/96 for Terica Baker, for Alice King, for Sandra Baker, for Edna Foster, for Linda Woods (dkt clerk)
6
05/10/1996
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on Jimmy Peters on 5/9/96 for Jimmy Peters. Answer due on 5/29/96 for Jimmy Peters (dkt clerk)
7
07/11/1996
ORDER that the plaintiff promptly file a motion for entry of default or some other pleading to put this case at issue, and to mail copies to the defendants (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel and defendants. (dkt clerk)
8
07/16/1996
ANSWER to Complaint by Edna Foster, Alice King, Sandra Baker, Terica Baker, Linda Woods (Attorney Lowell Landis Sexton), referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dkt clerk)
9
07/18/1996
MOTION by National Union Fire for Default Judgment against Jimmy Peters referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dkt clerk)
10
08/02/1996
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why plaintiff's motion for entry of default against defendant Jimmy Peters should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 8/16/96 for Jimmy Peters [9-1] motion for Default Judgment against Jimmy Peters by National Union Fire set for submission on 8/16/96 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Jimmy Peters (certified and regular mail) (dkt clerk)
11
08/06/1996
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of order to show cause of 8/2/96 on Jimmy Peters on 8/5/96 for Jimmy Peters. (dkt clerk)
12
09/04/1996
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jimmy Peters (signed by Thomas C. Caver, Clerk of the Court); copies mailed to counsel and defendant. (dkt clerk)
13
09/05/1996
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 8/26/97 before Judge W. H. Albritton III Motion Filing deadline on 5/28/97 ; Discovery cutoff 8/12/97 ; set amended pleading deadline for 11/19/96 Non-jury trial set for 10/14/97 before Judge W. H. Albritton III ; Mediation Notice deadline on 12/15/96 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Marie and Ern. (dkt clerk)
14
10/03/1996
STIPULATION of dismissal by National Union Fire, Edna Foster, Alice King, Sandra Baker, Terica Baker, Linda Woods; referred to Judge Albritton. (dkt clerk)
15
10/15/1996
ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, EL. (dkt clerk)
10/15/1996
Case closed (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.