Navally Xiong
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00172 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
doc
05/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
06/01/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
06/04/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
06/05/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
06/14/2018
Schedules A-J
11
06/14/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
12
06/14/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
13
06/14/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
14
06/14/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
15
06/14/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
06/14/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
06/24/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
17
06/28/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
07/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
07/20/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
07/20/2018
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.