Ned Simpson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02120 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
doc
05/21/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments
doc
05/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
doc
05/21/2018
Employee Income Records
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/21/2018
Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/22/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
05/25/2018
Tax Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
52
01/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.