Neil Lavern Rush
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2012-bk-05309 (alnb)

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[49] Order Granting). Notice Date 01/24/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 12-05309-TOM Neil Lavern Rush Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 51 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jan 24, 2018. db +Neil Lavern Rush, 149 Lake Terrace, Alabaster, AL 35007-4135 7635144 +AT&T MOBILITY, % BAY AREA CREDIT, PO BOX 467600, ATLANTA GA 31146-7600 7635143 +AT&T MOBILITY, PO BOX 105502, ATLANTA GA 30348-5502 7635145 +BARRINGTON HILLS, % National Credit System, 3750 Naturally Fresh Blv, Atlanta GA 30349-2964 7635146 +BROOKWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, % Central Finl Control, Po Box 66044, Anaheim CA 92816-6044 7635150 +CAPITAL ONE, % ZARZAUR & SCHWARTZ, PO BOX 11366, BIRMINGHAM AL 35202-1366 7635147 ++CAPITAL ONE, PO BOX 30285, SALT LAKE CITY UT 84130-0285 (address filed with court: Cap One, Po Box 85520, Richmond VA 23285) 7635149 +CAPITAL ONE, 6356 CORLEY ROAD, NORCROSS GA 30071-1704 7772814 +CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., PO Box 12907, Norfolk VA 23541-0907 7635152 +CASH CALL/WESTERN SKY, PO BOX 370, TIMBER LAKE SD 57656-0370 7635155 CREDIT MANAGEMENT, PO BOX 118288, CARROLLTON TX 75011-8288 7635148 +Cap One/ORCHARD BANK, Po Box 5253, Carol Stream IL 60197-5253 7635157 +ELIZABETH ARBET, 11 WALNUT DRIVE, NORTH AURORA IL 60542-1544 7635158 +EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, MSC #656 PO BOX 830529, BIRMINGHAM AL 35283-0529 7635159 +Emergency Physicians Associates, c/o Franklin Collection Service, PO Box 3910, Tupelo, MS 38803-3910 7635161 +FIRST PREMIER BANK, % CCB CREDIT SERVICES, PO BOX 272, SPRINGFIELD IL 62705-0272 7635160 +First Premier Bank, 601 S Minnesota Ave, Sioux Falls SD 57104-4868 7635162 +GALLERIA CROSSING APARTMENTS, 3708 LODGE DRIVE, BIRMINGHAM AL 35216-6202 7635163 +GASTROENTEROLOGY ASSOC., PO BOX 1180, SHARPSBURG GA 30277-0964 7635166 +HOSPITALIST SERVICES OF CENTRA, % Franklin Collection Sv, PO Box 3910, Tupelo MS 38803-3910 7635169 +JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, % CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, PO BOX 9004, RENTON WA 98057-9004 7635170 +NORTH FULTON HOSPITAL, % Central Finl Control, Po Box 66051, Anaheim CA 92816-6051 7654946 +National Credit Systems, Inc., PO Box 312125, Atlanta, GA 31131-2125 7635174 #STAR CASH PROCESSING, PO BOX 111, MIAMI OK 74355-0111 7635171 +Scana Energy Marketing, 3344 Peachtree Rd Ne Ste, Atlanta GA 30326-4808 7635175 TIOR CAPITAL LLC, 4086 LOCUST COURT, ANAHEIM CA 92801 7635176 +TIOR CAPITAL LLC, % NATIONAL CREDITOR ADJ, PO BOX 3023, HUTCHINSON KS 67504-3023 7635177 +US ATTORNEY, NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, 1801 FOURTH AVENUE NORTH, BIRMINGHAM AL 35203-2101 7635178 +US ATTORNEY GENERAL, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, 950 PENNSYLVANIA AVENUE, WASHINGTON DC 20530-0009 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. 7635142 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy_notifications@ccsusa.com Jan 23 2018 01:44:07 ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, PO BOX 55126, BOSTON MA 02205-5126 7681660 +E-mail/Text: g20956@att.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:36 AT&T Mobility II LLC, % AT&T Services, Inc, Karen Cavagnaro, Paralegal, One AT&T Way, Room 3A231, Bedminster, NJ 07921-2693 7769904 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Jan 23 2018 01:46:07 Ashley Funding Services, LLC its successors and, assigns as assignee of Syndicated, Office Systems, Inc., Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 7683600 +E-mail/Text: bnc@atlasacq.com Jan 23 2018 01:41:19 Atlas Acquisitions LLC, 294 Union St., Hackensack, NJ 07601-4303 7681659 +E-mail/Text: g17768@att.com Jan 23 2018 01:41:16 BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., % AT&T Services, Inc, Karen Cavagnaro, Paralegal, One AT&T Way, Room 3A231, Bedminster, NJ 07921-2693 7635151 +E-mail/Text: SpecialAccts@hfsllc.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:43 CARDIOVASCULAR ASSOCIATES, % Healthcare Financial S, 911 Flynt Dr, Flowood MS 39232-9572 7635153 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@cashcall.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:52 Cashcall Inc, 1600 S Douglass Rd, Anaheim CA 92806 7650958 +E-mail/Text: bncmail@w-legal.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:57 CASHCALL, INC., C/O WEINSTEIN & RILEY, PS, 2001 WESTERN AVE., STE. 400, SEATTLE, WA 98121-3132 7700852 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@consumerportfolio.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:59 CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC., P.O. BOX 57071, IRVINE, CA. 92619-7071 7635154 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@consumerportfolio.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:59 CPS, PO BOX 57071, IRVINE CA 92619-7071 7681269 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@consumerportfolio.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:59 Consumer Portfolio Services Inc, attn KC Jacobson cl sig, PO Box 57071, Irvine CA 92619-7071 7635156 Fax: 614-760-4092 Jan 23 2018 01:57:40 EASY MONEY, 7001 POST ROAD SUITE 300, DUBLIN OH 43016 7635164 E-mail/Text: brnotices@dor.ga.gov Jan 23 2018 01:41:42 GEORGIA DEPT OF REVENUE, 1800 CENTRUY BLVD NE, STE 16102, ATLANTA GA 30345-3205 7635165 E-mail/Text: brnotices@dor.ga.gov Jan 23 2018 01:41:42 GEORGIA DEPT. OF REVENUE, PO BOX 740399, ATLANTA GA 30374 7795767 E-mail/Text: brnotices@dor.ga.gov Jan 23 2018 01:41:42 Georgia Dept Of Revenue, 1800 Century Blvd NE Ste 17200, Atlanta, GA 30345 7635167 E-mail/Text: cio.bncmail@irs.gov Jan 23 2018 01:41:35 INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, CENTRALIZED INSOLVENCY OPS, PO BOX 7346, PHILADELPHIA PA 19101-7346 Case 12-05309-TOM13 Doc 50 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 3 District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 51 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (continued) 7663999 E-mail/Text: JCAP_BNC_Notices@jcap.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:08 Jefferson Capital Systems LLC, PO BOX 7999, SAINT CLOUD MN 56302-9617 7837153 +E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Jan 23 2018 01:46:09 PRA Receivables Management, LLC, POB 41067, Norfolk, VA 23541-1067 7710877 +E-mail/Text: csidl@sbcglobal.net Jan 23 2018 01:43:23 Premier Bankcard/Charter, P.O. Box 2208, Vacaville, CA. 95696-8208 7635173 E-mail/Text: appebnmailbox@sprint.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:08 SPRINT, PO BOX 105243, ATLANTA GA 30348-5243 7635172 +E-mail/Text: Supportservices@receivablesperformance.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:48 SPRINT, % Rcvl Per Mng, 20816 44th Ave W, Lynnwood WA 98036-7744 7668101 E-mail/Text: appebnmailbox@sprint.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:08 Sprint Nextel- Correspondence, Attn: Bankruptcy Dept, P O Box 7949, Overland Park, KS 66207-0949 TOTAL: 22 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** cr* +PRA Receivables Management, LLC, POB 41067, NORFOLK, VA 23541-1067 7635168* ++INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, CENTRALIZED INSOLVENCY OPERATIONS, PO BOX 7346, PHILADELPHIA PA 19101-7346 (address filed with court: IRS SPECIAL PROCEDURES STAFF, COLLECTION DIVISION, 801 TOM MARTIN DRIVE STOP 126, BIRMINGHAM AL 35211) TOTALS: 0, * 2, ## 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '++' were redirected to the recipient's preferred mailing address pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 342(f)/Fed.R.Bank.PR.2002(g)(4). Addresses marked '#' were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as requiring an update. While the notice was still deliverable, the notice recipient was advised to update its address with the court immediately. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jan 24, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on January 22, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Robert D. Reese on behalf of Debtor Neil Lavern Rush pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort3@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com TOTAL: 2 Case 12-05309-TOM13 Doc 50 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 3 720 81,7(' 67$7(6 %$1.5837&< &2857 1257+(51 ',675,&7 2) $/$%$0$ 6287+(51 ',9,6,21,Q WKH 0DWWHU RI 1HLO /DYHUQ 5XVK ` &DVH 1R 720 661;;;;; ents of counsel and the pleadings, the Motion is Granted and the Confirmation Order is modified as set forth in the Motion. 'DWHG aged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 3

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 271 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/07/2012
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $281 Filed by Neil Lavern Rush
3
11/07/2012
Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Neil Lavern Rush.
4
11/07/2012
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Neil Lavern Rush.
11/07/2012
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(12-05309-13) [misc,volp13] (281.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 14247056. Fee Amount 281.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/07/2012
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Neil Lavern Rush.
6
11/07/2012
Tax Documents for the Year for 2011 Filed by Debtor Neil Lavern Rush.
7
11/07/2012
For cause, it is ordered that the foregoing case is to be reassigned and transferred from Judge Thomas B Bennett to Judge Tamara O Mitchell.
8
11/08/2012
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11/08/2012
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Neil Lavern Rush Case Number 07-71662, Chapter 7 filed in Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/25/2007, Standard Discharge on 11/07/2007.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
11/08/2012
Amended (due to Judge Reassignment) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/5/2012 at 09:30 AM at Room 448 Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 2/4/2013.Proofs of Claims due by 3/5/2013.Government Proof of Claim due by 5/6/2013.
10
11/07/2012
**INCORRECT NOTICE DUE TO JUDGE REASSIGNMENT** Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/05/2012 at 09:30 AM at Room 448 Birmingham. Confirmation hearing will be set at a later date. Proof of Claim due by 03/05/2013. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/06/2013 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/04/2013. Modified on 11/8/2012
11
11/08/2012
Composition Letter (Pro Rata)
12
11/10/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 10) (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13) Southern Division). Notice Date 11/10/2012.
13
11/10/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 9) (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 11/10/2012.
14
11/10/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 11) (RE: related document(s) 11 Letter). Notice Date 11/10/2012.
15
11/10/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 5) (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Neil Lavern Rush). Notice Date 11/10/2012.
16
11/10/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 8) (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/10/2012.
17
11/12/2012
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Neil Lavern Rush.
18
11/12/2012
Certificate of Service For Compliance Documents Filed by Debtor Neil Lavern Rush (RE: related document(s) 11 Letter).
19
11/13/2012
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
20
11/28/2012
Notice of Confirmation Hearing Confirmation hearing to be held on 1/17/2013 at 11:00 AM at 505 20th St N Ctrm 2 (TOM) Financial Ctr Birmingham.
21
11/30/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 20) (RE: related document(s) 20 Notice of Confirmation Hearing). Notice Date 11/30/2012.
22
12/05/2012
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/5/2012.
23
12/13/2012
Financial Management Course Certificate Filed Filed by Debtor Neil Lavern Rush.
24
12/18/2012
Notice of Incorrect Claim: Due to an error having been made in the processing of Claim #6, the filer, Jorge Pineda, creditor representative/KC Jacobson cl sig, should make the following corrections: Rescan pdf of claim to ensure all pages are in the upright position and resubmit as amended claim #6.
25
12/20/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 24) (RE: related document(s) 24 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 12/20/2012.
26
01/16/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 01/17/2013 at 10:59 AM at 505 20th St N (TOM) Ctrm 2 Birmingham.
27
01/17/2013
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
28
01/24/2013
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 1/24/2013 (RE: related document(s) 20 Notice of Confirmation Hearing).
29
01/26/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 28) (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 01/26/2013.
30
01/29/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #12 filed by Emergency Physicians Associates. PROBLEM: The filer has filed a claim or claim attachments not in an upright position. SOLUTION: The filer, Emergency Physicians Associates, should AMEND the claim scanning it in the portrait orientation.
31
01/31/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 30) (RE: related document(s) 30 Notice of Incorrect Claim (PDF Not Upright Orientation)). Notice Date 01/31/2013.
32
04/20/2013
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Claim No. 14) To PRA Receivables Management, LLC Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
33
04/25/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 32) (RE: related document(s) 32 Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC). Notice Date 04/25/2013.
34
04/11/2017
Trustee's Objection to Claim # 3 of CASHCALL in the amount of $705.22 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, kc)
35
04/11/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 34 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting)). Hearing scheduled 5/18/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
36
04/13/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/13/2017.
37
05/17/2017
Trustee's Withdrawal Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting) (RE: related document(s) 34 Trustee's Objection to Claim # 3 of CASHCALL in the amount of $705.22 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting)). (Ch13troffice, kc)
38
07/19/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Debtor Neil Lavern Rush.
39
11/21/2017
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct)
40
11/21/2017
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 39 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 1/4/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
41
11/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 40 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 11/23/2017.
42
11/28/2017
Trustee's Withdrawal of Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway (RE: related document(s) 39 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments.). (Ch13troffice, ct)
43
11/28/2017
Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q) for Debtor Filed by Debtor Neil Lavern Rush.
44
12/27/2017
Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan After Confirmation. (Ch13troffice, km)
46
01/03/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 44 Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
47
01/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 46 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/05/2018.
48
01/19/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/18/2018 9:38:07 AM ]. File Size [ 418 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:10 ]. (RE: Doc #44; Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan After Confirmation (increasing pot amount to $6,400.00 so Georgia Dept of Revenue receives their portion of the pot)). (adiuser).
49
01/22/2018
Order Granting Signed on 1/22/2018. The Confirmation Order is modified as set forth in the Motion. (RE: related document(s) 44 Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan).
50
01/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[49] Order Granting). Notice Date 01/24/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.