Nekouee v. Cfra Alabama, Llc, et al. (joint Assign) (mag+)
Court Docket Sheet

2:2015-cv-00294 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 543 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/01/2015
COMPLAINT against CFRA Alabama LLC, and Wiley P. Johnson, filed by Fred Nekouee.
2
05/04/2015
Filing fee re 1 Complaint: $ 400.00, receipt number 4602036651
3
05/05/2015
Summons Issued as to CFRA Alabama LLC and Wiley P. Johnson; mailed CMRRR with copy of 1 Complaint.
4
05/05/2015
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Fred Nekouee. Corporate Disclosures due by 5/15/2015.
1
Standing ORDER and sample format
1 Attachment
5
05/05/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Fred Nekouee re 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
05/05/2015
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene. Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody no longer assigned to the case. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
05/05/2015
ORDER directing that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ยง 636, this case is referred to Honorable Paul Greene, United States Magistrate Judge, for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on May 5, 2015.
7
05/11/2015
Return Receipt Card showing service of 3 Summons and 1 Complaint signed by L. Payne for CFRA Alabama, LLC served on 5/6/2015, answer due 5/27/2015.
8
05/11/2015
Return Receipt Card showing service of 3 Summons and 1 Complaint signed by M. Johnson for Wiley P. Johnson served on 5/7/2015, answer due 5/28/2015.
9
05/27/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Wiley P. Johnson.
10
05/28/2015
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Wiley P. Johnson. Corporate Disclosures due by 6/8/2015.
1
Standing ORDER and sample format
1 Attachment
11
05/28/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time; Wiley P. Johnson answer due on or before 06/29/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on May 28, 2015. (No PDF document attached to this entry.)
12
05/28/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Taffiny Smith Stewart on behalf of CFRA Alabama, LLC (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2015: # 1 Corrected certificate of service).
13
05/28/2015
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by CFRA Alabama, LLC. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2015: # 1 Corrected certificate of service).
14
05/28/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wiley P. Johnson re 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
15
05/28/2015
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to CFRA Alabama, LLC. Corporate Disclosures due by 6/8/2015.
1
Standing ORDER and sample format
1 Attachment
16
05/28/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on May 28, 2015. (No PDF document attached to this entry.)
17
06/08/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by CFRA Alabama, LLC re 15 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
18
06/23/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by CFRA Alabama, LLC.
19
06/29/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Wylie Benjamin Johnson, Melanie Fay Johnson.
20
06/29/2015
MOTION for John J. Coleman, III to Withdraw as Attorney by Wiley P. Johnson.
21
06/30/2015
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Wylie Benjamin Johnson and Melanie Fay Johnson. Corporate Disclosures due by 7/10/2015.
1
Standing ORDER and sample format
1 Attachment
22
06/30/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wylie Benjamin Johnson re 21 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
23
06/30/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Melanie Fay Johnson re 21 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
24
06/30/2015
Order directing as follows: (1) the motion to withdraw filed by Mr. Coleman (Doc. 20) is GRANTED; (2) the parties are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by July 10, 2015 why Defendant Wiley P. Johnson, deceased, who is named in other filings of record as Wylie P. Johnson, deceased, and Wylie Benjamin Johnson, in his capacity as the personal representative of the Estate of Wylie P. Johnson, deceased, should not be dismissed from this lawsuit and Melanie Fay Johnson be joined as the proper named defendant. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on June 30, 2015.
06/30/2015
*** Attorney John James Coleman, III terminated as counsel of record for defendant Wiley P. Johnson pursuant to 24 Order. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
07/02/2015
Motion for Kelly D. Stohs to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melanie Fay Johnson, Wylie Benjamin Johnson.
07/02/2015
***Attorney Kelly D. Stohs for Melanie Fay Johnson and Wylie Benjamin Johnson added pursuant to 25 Motion. (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/06/2015
Filing fee re 25 Motion for Kelly D. Stohs to appear PHV: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602037454
27
08/11/2015
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CFRA Alabama, LLC, Melanie Fay Johnson, filed by Fred Nekouee.
1
Exhibit Summons-Melanie Fay Johnson
1 Attachment
28
08/11/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 25 Motion for Kelly D. Stohs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 8/11/2015. (No pdf attached to this entry)
29
08/12/2015
ORDER re 27 Amended Complaint: ORDERED that dfts CFRA Alabama, LLC and Melanie Fay Johnson are to file an answer to the amended complaint by 8/26/2015, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to realign the parties on the court's docket to reflect those named in the amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 8/12/2015.
30
08/13/2015
Unopposed First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Melanie Fay Johnson. Modified on 8/14/2015 to reflect actual title.
31
08/14/2015
ORDER that Defendant Melanie Fay Johnson's 30 Unopposed Motion for a sixty (60) day extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is GRANTED IN PART. All Defendants' answers to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint are due on or before 9/25/2015. CFRA Alabama, LLC answer due 9/25/2015; Melanie Fay Johnson answer due 9/25/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 8/14/2015.
32
09/23/2015
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Melanie Fay Johnson, CFRA Alabama, LLC. Modified on 9/23/2015 to add as also filed on behalf of dft CFRA Alabama, LLC.
33
09/24/2015
ORDERED that: (1) the 32 motion is GRANTED; (2) all Dfts shall file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plf's First Amended Complaint on or before 10/30/2015; and (3) Dfts are relieved of their obligation to answer or respond to Plf's First Amended Complaint if the parties file a stipulation of dismissal on or before 10/30/2015, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 9/24/2015.
34
10/08/2015
MOTION to Dismiss by Fred Nekouee.
35
10/22/2015
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), it is ORDERED that: (1) The plaintiffs motion to dismiss with prejudice (doc. no. 34) is granted. (2) This lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with costs taxed as paid.The court assumes that the defendants have no objection to the allowance of the dismissal; however, if they do, they must file the objection within seven days from the date of this order. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/22/2015.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.