Nekouee v. Drain Enterprises inc
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

5:2015-cv-00622 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 692 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/13/2015
COMPLAINT against Drain Enterprises Inc filed by Fred Nekouee.(AHI)
2
04/13/2015
CONFLICT Disclosure Statement by Fred Nekouee (AHI)
3
04/13/2015
Request for service by certified mail filed by Fred Nekouee.
04/15/2015
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B46010615340 (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
04/16/2015
Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Drain Enterprises Inc.
5
04/22/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed Drain Enterprises Inc served on 4/20/2015, answer due 5/11/2015.
6
05/11/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Drain Enterprises Inc.
7
05/12/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Drain Enterprises, Inc. Answer due 5/25/2015. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on May 12, 2015.
8
05/27/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Drain Enterprises Inc.
9
05/27/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Drain Enterprises Inc. filed by Drain Enterprises Inc
10
05/27/2015
ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 5/27/2015.
11
07/28/2015
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
12
08/13/2015
SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 2/1/2016; Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2016; Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 4/1/2016; Trial ready by 5/2016. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 8/13/2015.
13
04/14/2016
STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT by Drain Enterprises Inc. filed by Drain Enterprises Inc
14
04/15/2016
ORDER DISMISSING CASE that pursuant to joint stipulation of dismissal it is ORDERED that all claims asserted in plaintiff's complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and costs ate taxed as paid. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 4/15/2016.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.