Nell L McGowan
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00051 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/18/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
02/18/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
3
02/18/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
02/18/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
5
02/18/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
6
02/18/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
7
02/19/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
02/19/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
02/19/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
12
02/20/2019
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
13
02/20/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
14
02/20/2019
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
02/20/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
02/20/2019
Certificate of Service
16
02/20/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
02/20/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
02/20/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
18
02/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
19
02/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
20
02/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
21
02/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
22
03/01/2019
Request for Special Notice
03/20/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
03/20/2019
Entry of Appearance

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.