New Horizon Telecom, Inc. v. Everest Indemnity Insurance Company
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00297 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/18/2018
Notice of Removal
2
12/18/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
12/18/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
4
12/18/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
5
12/18/2018
Notice of Service List
6
01/04/2019
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
7
01/16/2019
Answer to Complaint
8
01/17/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
9
02/06/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
10
02/08/2019
Scheduling Order
11
03/22/2019
Witness List
12
05/06/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
05/08/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.