Nicholas Adam Howard and April Ann Howard
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00169 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
doc
05/31/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
05/31/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
doc
05/31/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
05/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
doc
05/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
doc
05/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
doc
06/01/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
06/05/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
13
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
14
06/26/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
06/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
06/26/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
16
06/26/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
06/28/2018
Generic Motion / Application
18
06/28/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
19
06/28/2018
Certificate of Service
07/10/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
21
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
22
07/20/2018
Request for Special Notice
23
07/20/2018
Certificate of No Objection
07/23/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
07/26/2018
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
25
07/27/2018
Generic Motion
07/27/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/03/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
08/10/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
28
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
29
08/14/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
08/16/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.