Nicholas Timothy White
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00142 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
06/05/2018
Request for Special Notice
06/18/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
07/05/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
07/10/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
07/11/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
17
07/12/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
18
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
19
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
20
07/19/2018
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
21
07/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/24/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
08/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
23
08/02/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
08/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
25
08/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
08/14/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.