Nicholas Wray Meyer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2017-bk-00116 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/31/2017
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Nicholas Wray Meyer
46
07/11/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
47
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
48
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
49
11/12/2018
Request for Special Notice
50
11/19/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
51
12/14/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
52
12/14/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
53
12/14/2018
Relief from Co-Debtor Stay (CM03)
54
12/14/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
55
12/14/2018
Certificate of Service
12/14/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
01/09/2019
Certificate of No Objection
57
01/09/2019
Certificate of Service
58
01/10/2019
Relief from Co-Debtor Stay
59
01/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/16/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.