Nicholls v. White Pass & Yukon U.S., Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cv-00001 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
16
05/31/2018
Witness List
17
05/31/2018
Witness List
18
07/16/2018
Notice of Appearance
19
07/19/2018
Witness List
20
08/14/2018
Dismiss
21
08/14/2018
Stipulation
22
08/15/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss
23
08/16/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
24
08/20/2018
Notice of Change of Address
25
08/28/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
26
08/28/2018
Declaration
08/29/2018
Order on Motion to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
08/30/2018
Protective Order
29
08/31/2018
Order
30
09/20/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
31
11/27/2018
Stipulation
32
11/28/2018
Order on Stipulation
33
12/19/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
34
12/21/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
35
01/18/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
36
01/22/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
37
02/26/2019
Order
38
03/01/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
39
03/04/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
40
03/05/2019
Notice of Appearance
41
03/06/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
42
03/11/2019
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
43
03/11/2019
Declaration
44
03/11/2019
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
45
03/11/2019
Declaration
46
03/11/2019
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
47
03/12/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
48
03/13/2019
Notice (Other)
49
03/13/2019
Order
50
03/14/2019
Order
51
03/18/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
52
03/18/2019
Affidavit
53
03/18/2019
Affidavit
54
03/19/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
55
03/19/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
03/19/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
03/19/2019
Order
57
03/19/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
58
04/01/2019
Pretrial Order
59
04/09/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.