Nikita Bobby Jagtiani and Bobby Chandru Jagtiani
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

5:2018-bk-00185 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/15/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
06/15/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
06/15/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
06/15/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
06/15/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
06/16/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
06/18/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
06/18/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
06/20/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
06/20/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
06/22/2018
Change of Address
15
06/22/2018
Certificate of Service
06/22/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
06/22/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
17
06/22/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
18
06/22/2018
Certificate of Service
19
06/22/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
06/25/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
07/11/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
21
07/11/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
22
07/11/2018
Certificate of Service
07/12/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
08/02/2018
Certificate of No Objection
24
08/03/2018
Relief from Stay
08/03/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
08/09/2018
Stipulation
26
08/10/2018
Approving Stipulation (SA)
08/10/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Update Deadline (Discharge / Closing) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
08/27/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
28
08/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
29
08/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
08/31/2018
Change of Address
31
08/31/2018
Certificate of Service
32
09/04/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
33
09/04/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
09/04/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
09/10/2018
Extend Time
35
09/12/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
36
09/17/2018
Letter From State Court Re: Stayed Case
09/19/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
09/19/2018
Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)
38
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim
10/04/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
10/05/2018
Stipulation
40
10/10/2018
Approving Stipulation (SA)
10/10/2018
Update Deadline (Discharge / Closing) (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
10/17/2018
Certificate of No Objection
42
10/18/2018
Extend Time
43
10/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
44
10/23/2018
Stipulation
45
10/24/2018
Approving Stipulation (SA)
10/24/2018
Update Deadline (Discharge / Closing) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.