NordAq Energy, Inc. v. Devine
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00267 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/21/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
194
02/27/2018
ORDER: re NordAq's Motion to Dismiss 103. Mr. Devine may file a Third Amended Answer and Counterclaim(s) consistent with the terms of this order, but must do so no later than March 13, 2018 (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 02/27/2018. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
251
05/25/2018
Compel
252
05/25/2018
Memorandum
253
05/29/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
254
05/29/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
255
05/29/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
256
05/29/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
257
05/29/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
258
05/29/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
259
05/31/2018
Errata
260
05/31/2018
Status Report
261
06/05/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
262
06/06/2018
Stipulation
263
06/06/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
06/07/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
267
06/15/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
06/19/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
269
06/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
270
06/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
271
06/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
272
06/20/2018
Response in Support of Motion
273
06/20/2018
Response in Support of Motion
274
06/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
275
06/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
276
06/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
277
06/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
278
06/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
279
06/22/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
280
06/22/2018
Hearing
281
06/29/2018
Protective Order
282
07/03/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
283
07/06/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
285
07/06/2018
Notice (Other)
286
07/06/2018
Affidavit
07/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
290
07/12/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
291
07/20/2018
Compel
292
07/21/2018
Memorandum
293
07/27/2018
Continue
294
07/28/2018
Compel
295
07/28/2018
Notice (Other)
07/30/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
299
08/01/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
08/02/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
302
08/06/2018
Order on Motion to Compel
303
08/10/2018
Declaration
304
08/13/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
305
08/13/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
306
08/15/2018
Dismiss
08/16/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
308
08/17/2018
Response to Order
309
08/20/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
310
08/23/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
10/04/2018
Order on Motion to Seal Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
316
10/04/2018
Notice (Other)
317
12/06/2018
Notice (Other)
318
01/04/2019
Order
319
01/04/2019
Order
320
01/09/2019
Notice of Appearance
321
01/11/2019
Declaration
322
01/11/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
323
01/18/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
324
01/22/2019
Stipulation
325
01/23/2019
Order on Stipulation
326
01/23/2019
Transcript
327
01/24/2019
Order
328
01/25/2019
ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: granting 209 Motion to Dismiss; granting 211 Motion to Dismiss; granting 215 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 216 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 217 Mo tion to Dismiss; granting 219 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 221 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 223 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 226 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 228 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 01/25/2019.
329
02/08/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
02/11/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
331
02/13/2019
Stay
332
02/15/2019
Order on Motion to Stay
333
04/05/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.