Nordlund v. Lyou et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00013 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
06/25/2018
Notice of Change of Address
10
06/25/2018
Amended Complaint
11
08/06/2018
Notice of Change of Address
13
10/10/2018
Order
14
11/20/2018
Response to Order to Show Cause
15
11/29/2018
Order
16
01/04/2019
Order
17
01/04/2019
Response to Order to Show Cause
18
01/09/2019
Order
19
02/22/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
20
02/25/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.