Norman Gale Bakkala
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2012-bk-00229 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
57
06/08/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
58
06/08/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
59
08/15/2018
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
60
08/17/2018
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
61
08/17/2018
Certificate of Service
62
09/11/2018
Certificate of No Objection
63
09/18/2018
Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)
09/18/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.