NorthPeak Wireless, LLC v. 3Com Corporation et al

5:2008-cv-01813 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 15 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/01/2008
COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350, receipt #500 56119.), filed by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
1
Exhibits - part 2
1 Attachment
2
10/06/2008
Request for service by certified mail filed by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
3
10/08/2008
Summons Issued as to Dell, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Fujitsu Computer Systems Corporation, Gateway, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Iogear, Inc., MSI Computer Corp, Netgear, Inc., Rosewill, Inc., Sandisk Corporation, SEH Technology, Inc., SMC Networks, Inc., SonicWall, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Trendnet Systems, Inc., Trendware International, Inc., U.S. Robotics Corporation, Viewsonic Corporation, Watchguard Technologies, Inc., Zonet USA Corporation, Zyxel Communications, Inc., 3Com Corporation, Acer America Corporation, ASUS Computer International Corporation, Belkin International, Inc., Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc.; mailed certified mail.
4
10/09/2008
NOTICE by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC
5
10/16/2008
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to dfts Fujitsu Computer Systems Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Company, Sandisk Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., and 3Com Corporation served on 10/9/2008
6
10/16/2008
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to dfts D-Link Systems, Inc., Iogear, Inc., Rosewill, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., and Zyxel Communications, Inc. served on 10/10/2008
7
10/16/2008
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Epson America, Inc. (ASL)
8
10/17/2008
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
9
10/20/2008
ORDER granting 8 Motion to appear pro hac vice for attorneys John C. Herman, Ryan K. Walsh, E. Joseph Benz III and Jason S. Jackson; subject to payment of the fees. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/20/08.
10
10/20/2008
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to dfts Gateway, Inc., SMC Networks, Inc. Watchguard Technologies, Inc., and Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc. served on 10/14/2008
11
10/20/2008
ALIAS Summons issued as to Epson America, Inc.; del to pla for service
12
10/20/2008
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to dfts Dell, Inc., MSI Computer Corp, Netgear, Inc., SonicWall, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc., Trendnet Systems, Inc., Trendware International, Inc., Viewsonic Corporation, Zonet USA Corporation, Acer America Corporation, and ASUS Computer International Corporation
13
10/23/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
14
10/24/2008
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to dft Epson America, Inc.
15
10/27/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Unopposed) by Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
16
10/27/2008
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
17
10/27/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
18
10/27/2008
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by SMC Networks, Inc., 3Com Corporation, ASUS Computer International Corporation.
19
10/28/2008
Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by SMC Networks, Inc., 3Com Corporation, ASUS Computer International Corporation.
20
10/28/2008
ORDER granting 19 Amended Motion for Extension of Time, dfts shall file a response to complaint on or before 12/5/08; finding as moot 18 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/28/08.
21
10/28/2008
ORDER granting 15 Motion for extension of time to file a responsive pleading, dfts shall file response to complaint on or before 12/5/08; granting 16 Motion for pro hac vice; subject to payment of the fee. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/28/08.
22
10/28/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer by Hewlett-Packard Company.
10/28/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 200 251204 (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
10/29/2008
ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; dft Hewlett-Packard Company shall file a response to complaint on or before 12/5/08. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/29/08.
24
10/29/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time by Fujitsu Computer Systems Corporation.
25
10/29/2008
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (UNOPPOSED) by Sandisk Corporation, Belkin International, Inc.
26
10/29/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3Com Corporation.
27
10/29/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SMC Networks, Inc.
28
10/30/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time by D-Link Systems, Inc., Iogear, Inc., Netgear, Inc., Zyxel Communications, Inc.
29
10/30/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time [Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading] by Watchguard Technologies, Inc., Acer America Corporation.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
30
10/30/2008
ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time, these dfts shall file a reponse to the complaint on or before 12/5/2008. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/30/2008.
31
10/30/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASUS Computer International Corporation.
32
10/30/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Belkin International, Inc.
33
10/30/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sandisk Corporation.
34
10/30/2008
ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time; these dfts shall file a reponse to complaint on or before 12/5/08. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/30/08.
35
10/30/2008
ALIAS Summons issued as to dfts MSI Computer Corp, SEH Technology, Inc., Trendnet Systems, Inc., Trendware International, Inc., and U.S. Robotics Corporation; del to pla for service.
36
10/30/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fujitsu Computer Systems Corporation.
37
10/31/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time by Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc.
38
10/31/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed by Dell, Inc.
39
10/31/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dell, Inc.
40
11/03/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time by SonicWall, Inc.
41
11/03/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SonicWall, Inc.
42
11/03/2008
ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time; these dfts shall file a response to complaint on or before 12/5/08. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/3/08.
43
11/03/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time by Zonet USA Corporation.
44
11/03/2008
NOTICE of Appearance by C Meade Hartfield, Jr on behalf of Gateway, Inc., Watchguard Technologies, Inc., Acer America Corporation
11/03/2008
NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan B Cooper, Harlan I Prater, IV on behalf of Gateway, Inc., Watchguard Technologies, Inc., Acer America Corporation (see doc # 44) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/03/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 200.00, receipt number 500 56160 & 500 56159 for attys Herman, Walsh, Benz, and Jackson (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
11/03/2008
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to SEH Technology, Inc. (ASL)
46
11/03/2008
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to dft U.S. Robotics Corporation
47
11/03/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time by Rosewill, Inc.
48
11/03/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time by Viewsonic Corporation.
49
11/03/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (Unopposed) by MSI Computer Corp. (Smith T, John)
50
11/04/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by D-Link Systems, Inc.
51
11/04/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zyxel Communications, Inc.
52
11/04/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zarian and Herberholz by Rosewill, Inc., Viewsonic Corporation.
53
11/04/2008
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC. MSI Computer Corp served on 11/3/2008, answer due 11/24/2008.
54
11/04/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Sony Corporation of America Without Prejudice by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
55
11/05/2008
NOTICE of Appearance by W Alexander Moseley on behalf of Fujitsu Computer Systems Corporation, SonicWall, Inc.
56
11/05/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Karl A. Kramer and Christopher F. Jeu by Fujitsu Computer Systems Corporation, SonicWall, Inc.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Karl A. Kramer
2
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Christopher F. Jeu
2 Attachments
57
11/05/2008
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC. Trendnet Systems, Inc. served on 10/31/2008, answer due 11/20/2008; Trendware International, Inc. served on 10/31/2008, answer due 11/20/2008.
58
11/05/2008
ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time; dft SonicWall, Inc. shall file a response to complaint on or before 12/5/08. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/5/08.
59
11/05/2008
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
60
11/05/2008
ORDER re 54 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by pla NorthPeak Wireless, LLC and dft Sony Corporation of America; pla's claims against dft Sony Corporation of America are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A) of the FRCP. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/5/08.
61
11/05/2008
ORDER granting 52 Motion for admission pro hac vice of John N. Zarian and Dana M. Hreberholz; subject to payment of the fees. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/5/08.
11/05/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 200 251481 for atty Agarwal (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
11/05/2008
ORDER granting 43, 47, 48, 49 Motions for Extension of Time; dfts MSI Computer Corp, Rosewill, Inc., Viewsonic Corporation, and Zonet USA Corporation shall file a response to complaint on or before 12/5/2008. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/5/08.
63
11/06/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission by SMC Networks, Inc., 3Com Corporation, ASUS Computer International Corporation.
64
11/06/2008
ORDER granting 59 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Pavan K. Agarwal; subject to payment of the fee. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/6/08.
65
11/06/2008
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by U.S. Robotics Corporation.
66
11/06/2008
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC. SEH Technology, Inc. served on 10/30/2008, answer due 11/19/2008.
11/06/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 100.00, receipt number 500 56164 for attys Zarian and Herberholz (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
11/07/2008
ORDER granting 65 Motion for Extension of Time; dft U.S. Robotics Corporation shall file its response to complaint on or before 12/5/2008. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/7/08.
68
11/07/2008
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zonet USA Corporation.
69
11/07/2008
NOTICE of Appearance by Frank M Caprio on behalf of MSI Computer Corp
70
11/07/2008
ORDER granting 56 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Karl A. Kramer and Christopher F. Jeu; subject to payment of the fees. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/6/08.
71
11/07/2008
ORDER granting 63 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Richard C. Vasquez, Avin P. Sharma, Eric W. Benisek, Jeffrey T. Lindgren, Craig E. Davis, Stephen C. Steinberg, and Robert S. McArthur; subject to payment of the fees. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/7/08.
72
11/07/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Unopposed) by Epson America, Inc.
73
11/10/2008
ORDER granting 68 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Jen-Feng Lee and Kenneth Tanji; subject to payment of the fee. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/10/08.
74
11/10/2008
MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Kai Tseng)] by Gateway, Inc., Watchguard Technologies, Inc., Acer America Corporation.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
75
11/10/2008
MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Michael C. Spillner)] by Gateway, Inc., Watchguard Technologies, Inc., Acer America Corporation.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
76
11/10/2008
MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Jerry Chen)] by Gateway, Inc., Watchguard Technologies, Inc., Acer America Corporation.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
77
11/10/2008
MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Thomas H. Zellerbach)] by Gateway, Inc., Watchguard Technologies, Inc., Acer America Corporation.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
78
11/10/2008
ORDER granting 72 Motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading; dft Epson America, Inc. shall file response to complaint on or before 12/5/08. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/10/08.
79
11/10/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zonet USA Corporation.
80
11/10/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bijal V. Vakil by MSI Computer Corp. (Smith T, John)
81
11/10/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jack Q. Lever, Jr. by MSI Computer Corp. (Smith T, John)
82
11/10/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings by MSI Computer Corp. (Smith T, John)
83
11/10/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Toshiba America, Inc. Without Prejudice by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
84
11/10/2008
ORDER granting 74, 75, 76, 77 Motions for admission pro hac vice of Kai Tseng, Michael C. Spillner, Jerry Chen, and Thomas H. Zellerbach; subject to payment of the fees. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/10/08.
11/10/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 350.00, receipt number 200 251641 for attys Vasquez, Sharma, Benisek, Lindgren, Davis, Steinberg, and McArthur (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/10/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 200.00, receipt number 200 251675 for attys Tseng, Spillner, Chen, and Zellerbach (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
11/11/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice by U.S. Robotics Corporation.
86
11/11/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice - William B. Dyer III by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
87
11/11/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice - Roger D. Taylor by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
88
11/12/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice by Epson America, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
11/12/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 150.00, receipt number 200 251680 for attys Vakil, Lever, and Etienne-Cummings (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
11/12/2008
ORDER re 83 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by pla NorthPeak Wireless LLC and dft Toshiba America, Inc.; pla's claims against dft Toshiba America, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 41(a)(1)(A) of the FRCP. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/12/08.
90
11/12/2008
ORDER granting 80 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Bijal V. Vakil (doc # 80), Jack Q. Lever, Jr. (doc # 81), and Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings (doc # 82). Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/12/08.
91
11/12/2008
ORDER granting 85 Motion for admission pro hac vice of David S. Bloch; granting Motion for admission pro hac vice of William B. Dyer III (doc # 86), and of Roger D. Taylor (doc # 87); granting 88 Motion for admission pro hac vice for Christopher P. Broderick. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/12/08.
92
11/12/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice by Epson America, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
93
11/13/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice by Sandisk Corporation, Belkin International, Inc.
94
11/13/2008
ORDER granting 92 Motion to admit counsel pro hac vice for the admission of Richard de Bodo as counsel for dft Epson America, Inc.; subject to payment of the applicable fees. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/13/08.
11/13/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 100.00, receipt number 200 251713 for attys Dyer and Taylor (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 50.00, receipt number 200 251731 for atty de Bodo and $50.00, receipt number 200 251730 for atty Broderick (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 50.00, receipt number 200 251742 for atty Bloch (Text entry; no document attached.)
95
11/13/2008
ORDER granting 93 Motion for admission pro hac vice for David Enzminger, Ryan Yagura, Vision Winter and Nick Whilt, as counsel for dfts Belkin International and SanDisk Corporation; subject to payment of applicable fees. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/13/08.
96
11/14/2008
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hewlett-Packard Company.
97
11/17/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc.
11/17/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 200.00, receipt number 200 251785 for Enzminger, Yagura, Winter and Whilt (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/17/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 100.00, receipt number 200 251772 for Jen-Feng Lee and Kenneth Tanji (Text entry; no document attached.)
98
11/17/2008
ORDER granting 96 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Ira Claborn Rogers, R.L. Rambo, Clay Erik Hawes, David Jack Levy, and Lindsay Kathryn Cowart; subject to payment of the fees. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/17/08.
99
11/17/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Trendnet Systems, Inc., Trendware International, Inc.
100
11/18/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSI Computer Corp. (Smith T, John)
101
11/18/2008
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SEH Technology, Inc.
102
11/18/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SEH Technology, Inc.
103
11/19/2008
ORDER granting 99 Motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading; dfts Trendnet Systems, Inc. and Trendware International, Inc. shall file their response to the complaint on or before 12/5/2008. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/19/08.
104
11/19/2008
ORDER granting 101 Motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading; dft SEH Technology, Inc. shall file its response to complaint on or before 12/5/2008. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/19/08.
105
11/19/2008
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by D-Link Systems, Inc., Zyxel Communications, Inc.
1
Exhibit A, B, and C
1 Attachment
11/20/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 250, receipt number 500 56179 for attys Rogers, Rambo, Hawes, Levy, and Cowart (Text entry; no document attached.)
106
11/20/2008
ORDER granting 105 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Christine Young, Duncan Palmatier, and Lisa Case; subject to payment of the fees. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/20/08.
107
11/20/2008
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas Edward Nelson by Hewlett-Packard Company.
11/20/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 150.00, receipt number 200 251930 for attys Yang, Palmatier, and Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
108
11/21/2008
ORDER granting 107 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Thomas Edward Nelson; subject to payment of the fee. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/21/08.
109
11/24/2008
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dell, Inc.
1
Exhibit Flinn Certificate of Good Standing
2
Exhibit Haynes Certificate of Good Standing
3
Exhibit White Certificate of Good Standing
3 Attachments
110
11/25/2008
ORDER granting 109 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Patrick J. Flinn, John D. Haynes and Stacey G. White; subject to payment of applicable fees. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 11/25/08.
11/25/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 500 56194 for atty Thomas Nelson (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/25/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 150.00, receipt number 200 252006 for attys Flinn, Haynes, and White (Text entry; no document attached.)
111
11/25/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hewlett-Packard Company.
112
11/29/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trendnet Systems, Inc.
113
11/29/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trendware International, Inc.
114
12/01/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission by Epson America, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
115
12/01/2008
ORDER granting 114 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Andrew V. Devkar; subject to payment of the fee. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 12/1/08. (ASL)
12/01/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 200 252086 for atty Devkar (Text entry; no document attached.)
116
12/03/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Robotics Corporation.
117
12/05/2008
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Netgear, Inc.
118
12/05/2008
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Netgear, Inc.
119
12/05/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission of Michael Jacobs by SonicWall, Inc.
120
12/05/2008
ANSWER to Complaint by Netgear, Inc.
121
12/05/2008
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by U.S. Robotics Corporation.
122
12/05/2008
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Zonet USA Corporation.
2
Exhibit 2)(Lee, Jen-Feng) (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="12/05/2020" time="">12/5/20</a>08: #
3
Exhibit 1
2 Attachments
123
12/05/2008
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Trendnet Systems, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2)(Lee, Jen-Feng
2 Attachments
124
12/05/2008
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Trendware International, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2)(Lee, Jen-Feng
2 Attachments
125
12/05/2008
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.
126
12/05/2008
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.
127
12/05/2008
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Belkin International, Inc.
128
12/05/2008
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Sandisk Corporation.
129
12/05/2008
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint, Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by D-Link Systems, Inc.
130
12/05/2008
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Dell, Inc.
131
12/05/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Epson America, Inc.
132
12/05/2008
ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Epson America, Inc.
12/05/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 200 252320 for atty Michael Jacobs (Text entry; no document attached.)
133
12/05/2008
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Iogear, Inc.
134
12/05/2008
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by SMC Networks, Inc.
135
12/05/2008
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint, Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Iogear, Inc.
136
12/05/2008
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to dft U.S. Robotics Corporation (c/o CT Corporation System)
137
12/05/2008
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Hewlett-Packard Company.
138
12/05/2008
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by ASUS Computer International Corporation.
139
12/05/2008
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Acer America Corporation
140
12/05/2008
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Gateway, Inc.
141
12/05/2008
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Watchguard Technologies, Inc.
142
12/05/2008
SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION of Notorized Declaration/Affidavit in support of motion, doc # 122 by Zonet USA Corporation. Modified on 12/5/2008.
1
Affidavit for Zonet)(Lee, Jen-Feng
1 Attachment
143
12/05/2008
SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION of Notarized Declaration/Affidavit in support of motion, doc # 123 by Trendnet Systems, Inc. Modified on 12/5/2008.
1
Affidavit for Trendnet)(Lee, Jen-Feng
1 Attachment
144
12/05/2008
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by 3Com Corporation.
145
12/05/2008
SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION of Notarized Declaration/Affidavit in support of motion, doc # 124 by Trendware International, Inc. Modified on 12/5/2008.
1
Affidavit for Trendware)(Lee, Jen-Feng
1 Attachment
146
12/05/2008
Acer America Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Acer America Corporation.
147
12/05/2008
Gateway Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Gateway, Inc.
148
12/05/2008
Watchguard Technologies, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Watchguard Technologies, Inc.
149
12/05/2008
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue, Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(2) and (3) by Zyxel Communications, Inc.
1
Exhibit Declaration of Duncan Palmatier - Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit Declaration of Dana Patrick Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
150
12/05/2008
ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
151
12/05/2008
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc.
152
12/05/2008
MSI Computer Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by MSI Computer Corp.(Smith T, John)
153
12/05/2008
Rosewill Inc's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Rosewill, Inc.
154
12/05/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rosewill, Inc.
155
12/05/2008
ViewSonic Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Viewsonic Corporation.
156
12/05/2008
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viewsonic Corporation.
157
12/05/2008
SonicWALL, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by SonicWall, Inc.
158
12/05/2008
FUJITSU COMPUTER SYSTEMS CORPORATIONS ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Fujitsu Computer Systems Corporation.
12/08/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 200.00, receipt number 200 252370 for attys DiBoise, Chin, Smith and Argenti (Text entry; no document attached.)
159
12/08/2008
ORDER re 123 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Trendnet Systems, Inc., 122 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Zonet USA Corporation, 124 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Trendware International, Inc., 149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue, Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(2) and (3) filed by Zyxel Communications, Inc.; pla is ORDERED to respond to said motions on or before 1/10/09. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 12/8/08.
160
12/08/2008
ORDER granting 119 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Michael A. Jacobs. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 12/8/08.
161
12/08/2008
ORDER granting 118 Motion for admission pro hac vice of James A. DiBoise, Roger J. Chin, Ryan R. Smith, and Matthew A. Argenti. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 12/8/08.
162
12/10/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission pro hac vice for Russell W. Faegenburg by Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc.
163
12/10/2008
ORDER granting 162 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Russell W. Faegenburg; subject to payment of the fee. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 12/10/08.
164
12/10/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Meeting (UNOPPOSED) by 3Com Corporation.
165
12/11/2008
ORDER granting 164 Motion to extend time to conduct Rule 26(f) discovery meeting; parties are allowed until 12/18/08 to conduct Rule 26(f) meeting. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 12/11/08.
12/11/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 200 252496 for atty Faegenburg (Text entry; no document attached.)
166
12/12/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission pro hac vice for Andrew T. Zidel by Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc.
167
12/12/2008
MOTION for Limited Admission pro hac vice for Joseph S. Littenberg by Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc.
168
12/15/2008
ORDER granting 166 Motion for Limited Admission pro hac vice for Andrew T. Zidel; granting 167 Motion for Limited Admission pro hac vice for Joseph S. Littenberg, subject to payment of applicable fees. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 12/15/2008.
12/15/2008
PHV Fee paid: $ 100.00, receipt number 200 252561 for attys Zidel and Littenberg (Text entry; no document attached.)
169
12/16/2008
MOTION to Change Venue (Joint as to 26 Defendants) by 3Com Corporation.
170
12/16/2008
Brief re 169 MOTION to Change Venue (Joint as to 26 Defendants).
171
12/16/2008
AFFIDAVIT re 169 MOTION to Change Venue (Joint as to 26 Defendants) (Defendants' Notice of Filing Declarations in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue) by 3Com Corporation.
1
Exhibit A-1
2
Exhibit A-2
3
Exhibit B - M
4
Exhibit N - Y
4 Attachments
172
12/17/2008
ORDER re 169 dfts' MOTION to transfer venue pursuant to 28:1404(a); pla is ORDERED to respond to said motion on or before 1/12/09. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 12/17/08.
173
12/18/2008
NOTICE by Netgear, Inc. Supplemental Documents to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
174
12/19/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
175
12/19/2008
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report of Parties Planning Meeting by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
176
12/22/2008
ORDER granting 174 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaims, the pla is allowed until 1/12/2009 to answer counterclaims; granting 175 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report of Parties Planning Meeting, the parties are allowed until 1/15/2009 to file their report of parties' planning meeting. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 12/22/2008.
177
12/29/2008
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Netgear, Inc.
178
12/31/2008
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 169 MOTION to Change Venue (Joint as to 26 Defendants) filed by Viewsonic Corporation.
1
Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer
169
None
2 Attachments
179
01/02/2009
NOTICE by Viewsonic Corporation of Filing Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue
180
01/05/2009
NOTICE of Change of Address by Gregory H Revera
181
01/05/2009
NOTICE of Change of Address by John W Smith T (Smith T, John)
182
01/06/2009
Amended ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Gateway, Inc.
183
01/06/2009
Amended ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Watchguard Technologies, Inc.
184
01/06/2009
Amended ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against NorthPeak Wireless, LLC by Acer America Corporation.
185
01/09/2009
Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Zonet USA Corporation.
186
01/09/2009
NOTICE by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC of Filing Declaration in Support of Opposition to Defendant Zonet USA Corporation's Motion to Dismiss
1
Exhibit Exhibits to the Declaration of Ryan K. Walsh in Support of NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's Opposition to Defendant Zonet USA Corporation's Motion to Dismiss
1 Attachment
187
01/09/2009
Opposition to re 123 TrendNet's Motion to Dismiss filed by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
188
01/09/2009
NOTICE by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC of Filing of Declaration in Support of Opposition to Defendant TrendNet Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss
1
Exhibit to Declaration of Ryan K. Walsh in Support of NorthPeak Wireless LLC's Opposition to Defendant TrendNet Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss
1 Attachment
189
01/09/2009
Opposition to re 124 TrendWare International, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
190
01/09/2009
NOTICE by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC of Filing of Declaration in Support of Opposition to Defendant TrendWare International, Inc.'s Motoin to Dismiss
1
Exhibit to the Declaration of Ryan K. Walsh in Support of N orthPeak Wireless, LLC's Opposition to Defendant TrendWare International, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss
1 Attachment
191
01/09/2009
Opposition to re 149 Motion to Dismiss by ZyXel Communications, Inc's Motion to Dismiss filed by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
192
01/09/2009
NOTICE by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC of Filing of Declaration in Support of Opposition to Defendant ZyXel Communications, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
193
01/12/2009
ORDER re 149 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Zyxel Communications, Inc., and 191 response to said motion filed by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC; dft Zyxel is allowed until 1/20/09 to file a reply. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 1/12/09.
194
01/12/2009
Plaintiff NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of 3Com Corporation by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
195
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC ANSWER to Counterclaim of ASUS Computer International by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
196
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC ANSWER to Counterclaim of Belkin International, Inc. by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
197
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Dell, Inc. by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
198
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Iogear, Inc. by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
199
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Hewlett-Packard Company by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
200
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Fujitsu Computer Systems Corporation by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
201
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Epson America, Inc. by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
202
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of D-Link Systems, Inc. by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
203
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of SanDisk Corporation by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
204
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Rosewill, Inc. by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
205
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of MSI Computer Corporation by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
206
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of SMC Network, Inc. by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
207
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Sony Electronics Inc. and Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
208
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of U.S. Robotics Corporation by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
209
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
210
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC' ANSWER to Counterclaim of ViewSonic Corporation by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
211
01/12/2009
Plaintiff, NorthPeak Wireless, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of SonicWall, Inc. by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
212
01/12/2009
Opposition to re 171, 170, 169 Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Under 18 USC 1404(a) filed by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
213
01/12/2009
NOTICE by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC re 212 Opposition (other) of Filing Declarations in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue
1
Exhibit Part 1
2
Exhibit Part 2
3
Exhibit Part 3
3 Attachments
214
01/15/2009
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
1
Appendix 1
1 Attachment
215
01/20/2009
MOTION to Intervene by Intel Corporation.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
216
01/20/2009
REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Zyxel Communications, Inc. re: 193 Order, In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Zyxel Communications, Inc.
1
Affidavit of Joseph Carton, Exhibit A & B
1 Attachment
217
01/20/2009
REPLY Brief filed by Defendant 3Com Corporation re: 169 MOTION to Change Venue (Joint as to 26 Defendants) filed by 3Com Corporation.
218
01/20/2009
AFFIDAVIT re 169 MOTION to Change Venue (Joint as to 26 Defendants) by 3Com Corporation.
1
Exhibit AA
1 Attachment
219
01/21/2009
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Zyxel Communications, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
1
Exhibit A - Sur-Reply
1 Attachment
220
01/21/2009
Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Acer America Corporation by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
221
01/21/2009
Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Gateway, Inc. by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
222
01/21/2009
Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. by NorthPeak Wireless, LLC.
223
01/21/2009
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Iogear, Inc.
1
Exhibit A & B
1 Attachment
224
01/21/2009
ORDER transferring case to another district: ORDER transferring case to the District of Northern California; original electronic record and certified copy of docket entries will be mailed to Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 1/21/2009.
01/26/2009
PHV Fee paid: $ 100.00, receipt number 200 253547 for attys Yang and Yoches (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.