Northern Alaska Environmental Center et al v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00030 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/18/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
05/18/2018
Notice (Other)
29
05/18/2018
Amended Complaint
05/18/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
05/18/2018
Leave to File Document
32
05/21/2018
Amended Complaint
33
06/04/2018
Answer to Amended Complaint
34
06/04/2018
Answer to Amended Complaint
35
06/04/2018
Summary Judgment
36
06/04/2018
Memorandum
37
06/04/2018
Declaration
38
06/04/2018
Declaration
39
06/04/2018
Declaration
40
06/04/2018
Declaration
41
06/04/2018
Declaration
42
06/04/2018
Declaration
43
06/04/2018
Declaration
44
06/04/2018
Declaration
45
06/05/2018
Notice of Appearance
46
07/24/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
47
07/24/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
48
08/07/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
49
08/10/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/13/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
12/06/2018
ORDER RE CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment at Docket 35 is DENIED; Intervenor-Defendant CPAI's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment at Docket 46 is GRANTED; and Federal Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment at Docket 47 is GRANTED. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/06/2018.
53
12/10/2018
Judgment
54
01/03/2019
Notice of Appeal
55
01/08/2019
USCA Case Number
56
01/08/2019
USCA Scheduling Order
57
01/16/2019
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
58
01/25/2019
Transcript
03/01/2019
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.