Northrim Bank v. KIMBERLY DENISE, official number 522585, et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00066 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
76
06/05/2018
Status Report
77
06/05/2018
Status Report
78
06/12/2018
~Util - Set Hearings
06/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
06/27/2018
Errata
81
06/27/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
82
06/27/2018
Pretrial Order
83
09/28/2018
Continue
84
09/28/2018
Memorandum
85
09/28/2018
Expedite
86
09/28/2018
Declaration
87
09/28/2018
Order on Motion to Expedite
09/28/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
12/24/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
90
12/24/2018
Memorandum
91
12/24/2018
Expedite
92
12/24/2018
Declaration
93
12/26/2018
Order on Motion to Expedite
94
01/02/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
95
01/23/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
96
02/05/2019
Counterclaim
97
02/12/2019
Continue
02/14/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
Scheduling Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
99
02/15/2019
Stipulation
100
02/19/2019
Order on Stipulation
101
02/19/2019
Answer to Counterclaim
102
02/19/2019
Summary Judgment
103
02/19/2019
Memorandum
104
02/19/2019
Declaration
105
02/19/2019
Declaration
106
02/20/2019
Affidavit
107
02/20/2019
Declaration
108
02/20/2019
Declaration
109
02/20/2019
Errata
110
02/20/2019
Errata
111
03/08/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
112
03/29/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
113
03/29/2019
Memorandum
114
04/01/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
115
04/02/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
116
04/02/2019
Memorandum
117
04/03/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
118
04/04/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
119
04/04/2019
Memorandum
120
04/05/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
121
04/05/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
122
04/05/2019
Declaration
123
04/06/2019
Declaration
124
04/08/2019
Errata
125
04/16/2019
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
126
04/17/2019
Judgment
127
04/24/2019
Order
128
05/17/2019
Order
129
05/24/2019
Status Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.