Nuri v. Prc, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

2:1997-cv-01036 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 543 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/03/1997
DEMAND for jury trial by Dawne C. Nuri
2
07/14/1997
ANSWER to Complaint by Billy F. Sprayberry (Attorney Thomas A. Radney)
07/23/1997
"Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge" mailed to counsel for parties (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/23/1997
SUMMONS issued for Litton/PRC, Inc., Billy F. Sprayberry, Gary Moss, Thomas MacFarlane, Robert Harrison; summons and complaint mailed by CMRRR to named defendants
4
07/25/1997
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on Billy F. Sprayberry on 7/24/97 for Billy F. Sprayberry, on John A. Balucki for Gary Moss. Answer due on 8/13/97 for Billy F. Sprayberry, for Gary Moss (ajr) Modified on 07/28/1997
5
07/28/1997
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on James S. Bellamy on 7/25/97 for Litton/PRC, Inc. Answer due on 8/14/97 for Litton/PRC, Inc.
6
08/01/1997
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on illegible on 7/28/97 for Thomas MacFarlane. Answer due on 8/17/97 for Thomas MacFarlane
7
08/01/1997
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on Samantha Auston on 7/29/97 for Robert Harrison. Answer due on 8/18/97 for Robert Harrison
8
08/22/1997
ANSWER to Complaint by Litton/PRC, Inc. (Attorney David M. Smith, Michael E. Turner), referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
08/22/1997
"Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge" mailed to counsel for deft. Litton/PRC (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/1997
CASE reassigned to Judge Myron H. Thompson (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/1997
File referred to Judge Thompson (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
09/25/1997
MOTION by Dawne C. Nuri to Dismiss Named Defendant (Exhibit A attached); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
11
10/02/1997
ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
12
10/02/1997
ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Dismiss Named Defendants Thomas McFarlane, Robert Harrison and Gary Moss without prejudice; that if other parties have objections to the dismissals, they must file objections within 7 days of this order (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
13
10/02/1997
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Dawne C. Nuri amending [1-1] complaint; jury demand
14
10/03/1997
ANSWER by Billy F. Sprayberry to first amended complaint referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson (ajr) Modified on 10/03/1997
15
10/08/1997
ORDER, setting Status Conference 8:45 10/21/97 before Judge Myron H. Thompson (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW, MT.
10/21/1997
Status Conference held before Judge Myron H. Thompson (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/23/1997
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 3/2/98 before Judge Myron H. Thompson, in Montgomery, Al; setting Motion Filing deadline on 12/2/97; setting Discovery cutoff 2/16/98; jury trial set for 4/13/98 before Judge Myron H. Thompson, in Montgomery, Al; setting amended pleading deadline for 1/6/98; Mediation Notice deadline on 2/1/98 (AOFORM 85 attached) (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson). copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, TW & Jury.
17
10/23/1997
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER, with regard to all substantive motions, directing as further set out in order (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson). Copies mailed to counsel.
18
10/30/1997
MOTION by Litton/PRC, Inc. to Extend Deadline for Dispositive Motions referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
19
11/03/1997
ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Deadline for Dispositive Motions to the extent that section 3 of the scheduling order of 10/23/97 is amended to reflect that all dispositive motions are to be filed no later than 30 days prior to the pretrial hearing; resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Motion Filing to 2/2/98 ; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW.
20
12/10/1997
MOTION by Dawne C. Nuri to Dismiss named defendant referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
21
12/12/1997
ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Dismiss defendant Billy F. Sprayberry; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
22
02/02/1998
MOTION by Litton/PRC, Inc. for Summary Judgment (Exhibits 1-13, Deposition excerpts of Nuri, Sprayberry, Visser, Bonfiglio, Holliman, McFarlane, Johnson, Harrison, Moss, and Volumes 1-3 of deposition of Dawne Nuri maintained in separate binders with file); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
23
02/02/1998
BRIEF by Litton/PRC, Inc. in support of [22-1] motion for Summary Judgment (w/attachment); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
24
02/04/1998
ORDER directing that the [22-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Litton/PRC, Inc. be set for submission on 2/25/98, without oral argument, as further set out in order (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson). Copies mailed to counsel.
25
02/04/1998
ORDER setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 11:50 AM on 3/2/98 before Judge Myron H. Thompson, in chambers in Montgomery, Al; directing the parties file a jointly Proposed Pretrial Order due 3/1/98; Jury Trial set for 4/13/98 before Judge Myron H. Thompson, in Montgomery, Al (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson). Copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT & TW.
26
02/11/1998
MOTION by Litton/PRC, Inc. to supplement evidence in support of defendants' motion for summary judgment (Exhibits A and B attached); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson (ajr) Modified on 02/11/1998
27
02/12/1998
ORDER granting [26-1] motion to supplement evidence in support of defendants' motion for summary judgment (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
28
02/18/1998
ORDER resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 8:00 3/13/98 before Judge Myron H. Thompson ; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW, MT.
29
02/25/1998
Response and BRIEF by Dawne C. Nuri in opposition to [22-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Exhibits A-Z and AA maintained in separate binder with file); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
31
03/03/1998
Notice Concerning Settlement Conference filed by Dawne C. Nuri referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
32
03/04/1998
ORDER resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 8:15 3/6/98 before Judge Myron H. Thompson ; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW, MT (ajr) Modified on 07/20/1998
33
03/04/1998
ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Amend [29-1] brief in opposition by Dawne C. Nuri (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
34
03/06/1998
MOTION by Litton/PRC, Inc. for Leave to File reply brief and supplement the record in support of motion for summary judgment (Telephone deposition of Suzanne Fennelly attacvhed); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
03/06/1998
Pre-Trial Conference held before Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3.6.98 (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
03/06/1998
BRIEF by Litton/PRC, Inc. in support of [22-1] motion for Summary Judgment (w/attachments); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
36
03/06/1998
ORDER setting Settlement (Mediation) Conference for 2:00 3/20/98 that on or before the close of business on 3/18/98 parties shall provide the undersigned judge with a confidential mediation conference statement as further set out in order; (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to SL, MT.
37
03/06/1998
PRETRIAL ORDER set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury selection set for 10:00 4/13/98 Jury Trial set for 10:00 4/13/98 before Judge Myron H. Thompson ; trial brief deadline on 4/8/98 proposed jury instructions due on 4/8/98 voir dire questions due 4/8/98 (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, TW, CAC. (dkt clerk)
38
03/09/1998
ORDER granting [34-1] motion for Leave to File reply brief and supplement the record in support of motion for summary judgment; that plaintiff has until 4:00 3/18/98 to respond to both the argument and evidence contained in defendants' reply brief in support of motion for summary judgment; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
40
03/18/1998
RESPONSE AND BRIEF by Dawne C. Nuri in opposition to [23-1] brief in support (w/attachments); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
03/20/1998
Settlement Telephone Conference held before Judge Myron H. Thompson (djy) Modified on 03/31/1998 (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
03/26/1998
MOTION by Dawne C. Nuri to Quash defendant's notice of deposition and request for production referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
42
03/26/1998
MOTION by Litton Industries, PRC Inc. for leave to take deposition out of time, for reopening of discovery, and to continue trial referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
43
03/26/1998
RESPONSE by Dawne C. Nuri in opposition to [42-1] motion for leave to take deposition out of time by PRC Inc., Litton Industries, [42-2] motion for reopening of discovery by PRC Inc., Litton Industries, [42-3] motion to continue trial by PRC Inc., Litton Industries; (Affidavit of Dawn Nuri attached as Exhibit A); referred to Judge Myron Thompson (ajr) Modified on 03/30/1998
44
03/30/1998
MOTION by Dawne C. Nuri in Limine for th defendants, any and all defense witnesses be instructed to refrain from making any mention on interrogation, directly or indirectly, in any manner whatsoever, either in opening statement, questioning of witnesses, closing statements or otherwise, concerning any of the matters set forth herein referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
45
03/30/1998
Voir Dire Questions by Dawne C. Nuri, referred to Judge Thompson.
46
03/31/1998
ORDER (1) denying defendants' 3-26-98 [42-3] motion to continue trial; (2) granting [42-1] motion for leave to take deposition out of time and [42-2] motion for reopening of discovery; (3) denying [41-1] motion to Quash filed 3-26-98 (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson). Copies mailed to counsel.
47
03/31/1998
Voir Dire Questions by Litton Industries, PRC Inc. Referred to Judge Thompson.
48
03/31/1998
MOTION by Litton Industries, PRC Inc. in Limine that certain subjects, items, categories, and evidence of other types be excluded from the trial for the reason that evidence of such subjects is inadmissible according to the Federal Rules of Evidence and other applicable law referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
49
03/31/1998
Proposed Jury instructions by Litton Industries, PRC Inc. Referred to Judge Thompson.
50
03/31/1998
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Litton Industries, PRC Inc. by Carole A. Golinski and Request for Leave to add trial counsel. Referred to Judge Thompson. (djy) Modified on 03/31/1998
51
03/31/1998
NOTICE of documents and depositions to be used by defendants at trial by Litton Industries, PRC Inc. Referred to Judge Thompson.
52
04/02/1998
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why motion in limine should not be granted; Response to Order to Show Cause due on 4/8/98 for PRC Inc., for Litton Industries (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
53
04/02/1998
ORDER granting request for leave to add trial counsel; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
54
04/02/1998
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why defendants motion in limine should not be granted; Response to Order to Show Cause due on 4/8/98 for Dawne C. Nuri (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
55
04/07/1998
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Dawne C. Nuri by Lowell Landis Sexton
56
04/08/1998
ORDER granting [55-1] motion for leave to add trial counsel (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
57
04/08/1998
RESPONSE by Litton Industries, PRC Inc. to [44-1] motion in Limine for th defendants, any and all defense witnesses be instructed to refrain from making any mention on interrogation, directly or indirectly, in any manner whatsoever, either in opening statement, questioning of witnesses, closing statements or otherwise, concerning any of the matters set forth herein by Dawne C. Nuri referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
58
04/08/1998
RESPONSE by Dawne C. Nuri to [48-1] motion in Limine that certain subjects, items, categories, and evidence of other types be excluded from the trial for the reason that evidence of such subjects is inadmissible according to the Federal Rules of Evidence and other applicable law by PRC Inc., Litton Industries referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
59
04/10/1998
ORDER granting [22-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to plaintiff's claim of retaliatory discharge; dismissing Litton Industries from this lawsuit; denying motion in all other respects; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
60
04/13/1998
Supplemental MOTION by PRC Inc. in Limine referring to: [48-1] motion in Limine that certain subjects, items, categories, and evidence of other types be excluded from the trial for the reason that evidence of such subjects is inadmissible according to the Federal Rules of Evidence and other applicable law by PRC Inc., Litton Industries referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
61
04/13/1998
MOTION by PRC Inc. in Limine referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
62
04/13/1998
MOTION by PRC Inc. in Limine (w/attachment); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
04/13/1998
Jury selection held before Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/13/98 (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/13/1998
Jury Trial held before Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/13/98 - 4/16/98 (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
04/14/1998
MOTION by PRC Inc. to disqualify counsel (w/attachments); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
64
04/14/1998
MEMORANDUM by PRC Inc. of points and authorities in support of [63-1] motion to disqualify counsel by PRC Inc. referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
65
04/14/1998
ORDER that the following motions are granted in part and denied in part as stated in open court on 4/13/98: granting in part, denying in part [62-1] motion in Limine, granting in part, denying in part [61-1] motion in Limine, granting in part, denying in part [60-1] supplemental amended motion in Limine, granting in part, denying in part [48-1] motion in Limine that certain subjects, items, categories, and evidence of other types be excluded from the trial for the reason that evidence of such subjects is inadmissible according to the Federal Rules of Evidence and other applicable law, granting in part, denying in part [44-1] motion in Limine for th defendants, any and all defense witnesses be instructed to refrain from making any mention on interrogation, directly or indirectly, in any manner whatsoever, either in opening statement, questioning of witnesses, closing statements or otherwise, concerning any of the matters set forth herein (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
66
04/15/1998
MOTION by PRC Inc. for Judgment as a Matter of Law referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
04/15/1998
Stamped ORDER (rendered 4/15/98 in court) denying [66-1] motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel. (ajr) Modified on 04/20/1998 (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
04/16/1998
MOTION by PRC Inc. for Judgment as a Matter of Law referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
68
04/16/1998
Court's Instructions to the Jury
69
04/20/1998
Courtroom Deputy's MINUTES of proceedings: JURY TRIAL held 4/13/98 through 4/16/98 - before Judge Myron H. Thompson (witness and exhibit list attached); 4/15/98 - DENYING defendant's oral motion for judgment as a matter of law - JURY VERDICT in favor of plaintiff
04/21/1998
Tele-conference held before Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/21/98 (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
04/17/1998
Jury Notes filed (ajr) Modified on 04/20/1998
71
04/17/1998
JURY VERDICT for Dawne C. Nuri
72
04/21/1998
Courtroom Deputy's MINUTES of proceedings: Telephone conference call held 4/21/98 before Judge Myron H. Thompson - re: Defendant's Motion For Judgment as a Matter of Law
04/24/1998
Court reporter's TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 4/21/98 - hearing on motion for judgment as a matter of law - held before Judge Myron H. Thompson (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
05/01/1998
RENEWED MOTION by PRC Inc. for Judgment as a Matter of Law referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
74
05/05/1998
ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to have the transcript prepared of the proceedings held in this case on 4/21/98 in chambers (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies furnished to MT.
75
05/06/1998
RESPONSE by Dawne C. Nuri in opposition to [73-1] motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by PRC Inc. referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
76
05/08/1998
ORDER denying [63-1] motion to disqualify counsel (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
77
05/15/1998
BRIEF by PRC Inc. in support of [73-1] renewed motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
78
07/02/1998
Plaintiff's Comments Relating to the Supreme Court's Rulings in Faragher v. City of Boca Raton and Burlington Industries, Inc. v. Kimberly B. Ellerth; referred to Judge Thompson
79
07/02/1998
Defendant PRC Inc.'s Submission in Light of Recent Supreme Court Decisions; referred to Judge Thompson
80
07/31/1998
JUDGMENT in the amount of $10,000.00 in compensatory damages for Dawne C. Nuri against PRC Inc.; taxing costs against defendant PRC for which execution may issue; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel
07/31/1998
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
08/03/1998
ORDER denying defendant PRC, Inc.'s motion for judgment as a matter of law and renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
82
09/17/1998
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.